Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2882747 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2882747



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 324
03.03.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
31.05.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
31.05.2016 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
27.04.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
07.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.04.2016 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 7
07.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
07.04.2016 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
01.04.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
10.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.03.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
10.03.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
10.03.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
21.12.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
21.12.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
21.12.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
21.12.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 56
21.12.2015 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 56
18.11.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
17.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.09.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
17.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
17.09.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
17.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
20.05.2015 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
01.04.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
26.03.2015 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
24.03.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.03.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.03.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.03.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.03.2015 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
13.03.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 2
13.03.2015 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
05.03.2015 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
05.01.2015 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
11.03.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 67
20.02.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
20.02.2014 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 57
25.11.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
25.11.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
25.11.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3