Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2882921

EP2882921 - GLAZING WITH EMBEDDED MICROSTRUCTURES FOR DAYLIGHTING AND SEASONAL THERMAL CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2017
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.12.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ecole Polytechnique Fédérale de Lausanne (EPFL)
EPFL-TTO EPFL
Innovation Park J
1015 Lausanne / CH
[2017/03]
Former [2015/25]For all designated states
Ecole Polytechnique Federale de Lausanne (EPFL)
EPFL-TTO EPFL
Innovation Park J
1015 Lausanne / CH
Inventor(s)01 / KOSTRO, André
Chemin d'Ondallaz 6
CH-1807 Blonay / CH
02 / SCHÜLER, Andreas
EPFL ENAC IIC LESO-PB
GC A0 391 (Bâtiment GC)
Station 18
CH-1015 Lausanne / CH
 [2015/32]
Former [2015/25]01 / KOSTRO, André
EPFL ENAC IIC LESO-PB
GC A0 402 (Bâtiment GC)
Station 18
CH-1015 Lausanne / CH
02 / SCHÜLER, Andreas
EPFL ENAC IIC LESO-PB
GC A0 391 (Bâtiment GC)
Station 18
CH-1015 Lausanne / CH
Representative(s)Grosfillier, Philippe
ANDRE ROLAND S.A.
P.O. Box 5107
1002 Lausanne / CH
[2015/25]
Application number, filing date13779919.307.08.2013
[2017/03]
WO2013IB56459
Priority number, dateEP2012017959607.08.2012         Original published format: EP 12179596
[2015/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014024146
Date:13.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2882921
Date:17.06.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2014
[2015/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2882921
Date:18.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:E06B9/264, H01L31/052, E06B9/24
[2015/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/25]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERGLASUNG MIT EINGEBETTETEN MIKROSTRUKTUREN FÜR DIE KONTROLLE DES TAGESLICHTEINFALLS UND DER SAISONALEN WÄRME[2016/30]
English:GLAZING WITH EMBEDDED MICROSTRUCTURES FOR DAYLIGHTING AND SEASONAL THERMAL CONTROL[2015/25]
French:VITRAGE COMPRENANT DES MICROSTRUCTURES INTEGRÉES POUR LA REGULATION THERMIQUE SAISONNIÈRE ET DE LA LUMIÈRE DU JOUR[2016/33]
Former [2015/25]VERGLASUNG MIT EINGEBETTETEN MIKROSTRUKTUREN ZUR RAUMAUSLEUCHTUNG UND JAHRESZEITENABHÄNGIGEN WÄRMESTEUERUNG
Former [2015/25]VITRAGE AVEC DES MICROSTRUCTURES INTÉGRÉES POUR PERMETTRE UN ÉCLAIREMENT LUMINEUX NATUREL ET UN CONTRÔLE THERMIQUE SAISONNIER
Entry into regional phase05.03.2015National basic fee paid 
05.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
05.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/25]
17.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.08.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
08.12.2016Fee for grant paid
08.12.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.08.2016
Opposition(s)19.10.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
IE07.08.2017
LU07.08.2017
MT07.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
[2018/43]
Former [2018/39]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
IE07.08.2017
LU07.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
Former [2018/34]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
IE07.08.2017
LU07.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
Former [2018/21]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
Former [2018/18]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2018/14]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2017/51]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2017/50]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2017/49]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2017/48]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2017/40]AT18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Cited inInternational search[IA]WO2010086720  (SINVENT AS [NO], et al) [I] 1-6,9-12 * page 8, lines 20-28; figures 1, 2, 7, 8 * * page 9, lines 15-22 * * page 11, line 1 - page 12, line 18 * * page 13, line 24 - page 14, line 5 * * page 16, lines 4-7 * [A] 7;
 [A]WO2009002350  (FRAZIER SCOTT [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [A]DE3927947  (INST SOLARENERGIEFORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *
by applicantFR2463254
 EP1072752
 EP0823645
 DE102009056362
 US2006196613
    - SMITH G.B., "Thin film angular selective glazing", SOLAR ENERGY, vol. 62
    - A. KOSTRO; A. SCHILLER; J.L. SCARTEZZINI, "Towards microstructured glazing for daylighting and thermal control", CISBAT 2011 PROCEEDINGS, pages 455 - 460