Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2907214

EP2907214 - ELECTRICAL INVERTER AND METHOD OF OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.02.2018
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.05.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.04.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.03.2018  [2018/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Université du Luxembourg
162 A, Avenue de la Faïencerie
1511 Luxembourg / LU
[2015/34]
Inventor(s)01 / JOSTOCK, Markus
Flurgartenstraße 9
54340 Leiwen / DE
 [2015/34]
Representative(s)Schiweck Weinzierl Koch Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Ganghoferstraße 68 B
80339 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/34]Schiweck, Weinzierl & Koch
European Patent Attorneys
Landsberger Straße 98
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date13780311.027.09.2013
[2015/34]
WO2013EP02908
Priority number, dateLU2012009208315.10.2012         Original published format: LU 92083
[2015/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2014060065
Date:24.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/17]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2907214
Date:19.08.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2014
[2015/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:H02J3/46, H02J3/38
[2015/34]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/34]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHER WECHSELRICHTER UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB[2015/34]
English:ELECTRICAL INVERTER AND METHOD OF OPERATION[2015/34]
French:ONDULEUR ÉLECTRIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT[2015/34]
Entry into regional phase13.05.2015National basic fee paid 
13.05.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
13.05.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/34]
15.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.04.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
22.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.10.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/13]
06.11.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2018/13]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.03.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
28.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201604   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.2016
30.09.201705   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]GB2483879  (ZHONG QINGCHANG [GB]) [A] 1-29 * figure 6 *
 [A]  - IOV F ET AL, "Power Electronics and Control of Renewable Energy Systems", POWER ELECTRONICS AND DRIVE SYSTEMS, 2007. PEDS '07. 7TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20071127), ISBN 978-1-4244-0644-9, pages P - 6, XP031242478 [A] 1-29 * page 20 - page 22 *
 [A]  - ADRIAN V TIMBUS ET AL, "Grid Impedance Identification Based on Active Power Variations and Grid Voltage Control", INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE, 2007. 42ND IAS ANNUAL MEETING. CONFE RENCE RECORD OF THE 2007 IEEE, IEEE, PI, (20070901), ISBN 978-1-4244-1259-4, pages 949 - 954, XP031146038 [A] 1-29 * page 1 - page 3 *
 [A]  - VASQUEZ J C ET AL, "Adaptive Droop Control Applied to Voltage-Source Inverters Operating in Grid-Connected and Islanded Modes", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20091001), vol. 56, no. 10, doi:10.1109/TIE.2009.2027921, ISSN 0278-0046, pages 4088 - 4096, XP011271188 [A] 1-29 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIE.2009.2027921
 [A]  - JOSEP M GUERRERO ET AL, "Decentralized Control for Parallel Operation of Distributed Generation Inverters Using Resistive Output Impedance", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20070401), vol. 54, no. 2, doi:10.1109/TIE.2007.892621, ISSN 0278-0046, pages 994 - 1004, XP011175314 [A] 1-29 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0007] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIE.2007.892621
 [A]  - CIOBOTARU M ET AL, "Online grid impedance estimation for single-phase grid-connected systems using PQ variations", POWER ELECTRONICS SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE, 2007. PESC 2007. IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20070617), ISBN 978-1-4244-0654-8, pages 2306 - 2312, XP031218627 [A] 1-29 * paragraphs [Section I] - [00IV]; figure 6 *