Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2844738

Designated contracting statesAL 
AT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HR 
HU 
IE 
IS 
IT 
LI 
LT 
LU 
LV 
MC 
MK 
MT 
NL 
NO 
PL 
PT 
RO 
RS 
SE 
SI 
SK 
SM 
TR 
Examination procedure09.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
Entry into regional phase24.11.2014National basic fee paid 
24.11.2014Search fee paid 
24.11.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.11.2014Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:11.03.2015 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO
Countries concerned:BA ME
 
Event date:11.03.2015 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20141124
 
Event date:11.03.2015 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:17.06.2015 
Event description:TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION
Owner Name:THE BRIGHAM AND WOMEN'S HOSPITAL, INC.
 
Event date:29.07.2015 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED
 
Event date:23.12.2015 
Event description:CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C12N 5/07 20100101AFI20151113BHEP
 
Event date:23.12.2015 
Event description:CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 48/00 20060101ALI20151113BHEP
 
Event date:23.12.2015 
Event description:DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT
Effective DATE:20151119
 
Event date:23.12.2015 
Event description:CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C12N 5/02 20060101ALI20151113BHEP
 
Event date:13.07.2016 
Event description:TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION
Owner Name:VCELL THERAPEUTICS, INC.
 
Event date:11.01.2017 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT
Effective DATE:20161212