Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2842102

EP2842102 - MULTI-ACTION POKER GAME AND METHOD OF CONDUCTING SAME VIA NETWORKED SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.12.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.01.2017  [2017/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PAC Gaming LLC
P.O. Box 670804
Dallas, TX 75367 / US
For all designated states
Frazin, Timothy
6930 Elmridge Drive
Dallas, Texas 75240 / US
[2015/10]
Inventor(s)01 / FRAZIN, Timothy
6930 Elmridge Drive
Dallas, Texas 75240 / US
 [2015/10]
Representative(s)Cordina, Kevin John
CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro
Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/10]Cordina, Kevin John
Olswang LLP
90 High Holborn
London WC1V 6XX / GB
Application number, filing date13782042.923.04.2013
WO2013US37819
Priority number, dateUS20121345400123.04.2012         Original published format: US201213454001
[2015/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013163198
Date:31.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2842102
Date:04.03.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2013
[2015/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR31.10.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06Q50/34, G06Q50/10, G07F17/32
[2016/03]
Former International [2015/10]G06Q50/34, G06Q50/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/10]
TitleGerman:POKERSPIEL MIT MEHREREN AKTIONEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUSFÜHRUNG DAVON ÜBER VERNETZTE SYSTEME[2015/10]
English:MULTI-ACTION POKER GAME AND METHOD OF CONDUCTING SAME VIA NETWORKED SYSTEMS[2015/10]
French:JEU DE POKER À ACTIONS MULTIPLES ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONDUITE DE CELUI-CI PAR L'INTERMÉDIAIRE DE SYSTÈMES EN RÉSEAU[2015/10]
Entry into regional phase24.11.2014National basic fee paid 
24.11.2014Search fee paid 
24.11.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.11.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/10]
15.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.07.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/03]
02.09.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201503   M06   Fee paid on   02.11.2015
30.04.201604   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2010001467  (BEHRENDSEN MARK C [US] ET AL) [X] 1,3,7,9,11 * abstract * * figures 1,4 * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0044] * [I] 2,4-6,8,10,12,13;
 [I]GB2477019  (POCKET KINGS LTD [IE]) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * page 8, line 13 - page 19, line 24 *;
 [I]US2006025221  (JAIN NITIN D [GI] ET AL) [I] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [I]US2011105224  (HARTMANN ANDREAS [GI] ET AL) [I] 1-13 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2010001467  (BEHRENDSEN, MARK C. ET AL.);
 [A]US2008194308  (FALCIGLIA, SAL);
 [A]WO2005087331  (GAMING CONCEPTS INC. ET AL.);
 [A]US2011105224  (HARTMANN, ANDREAS ET AL.);
 [A]KR20020043487  (ANDAMIRO CO., LTD.)