EP2860589 - HOLOGRAM TRANSCRIPTION FOIL, METHOD FOR PRODUCING IMAGE DISPLAY ELEMENT, IMAGE DISPLAY ELEMENT, AND PERSONAL AUTHENTICATION MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toppan Printing Co., Ltd. 5-1, Taito 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | [2015/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INOKUCHI, Masami c/o TOPPAN PRINTING CO. LTD. 5-1 Taito 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | [2015/16] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2015/16] | Application number, filing date | 13782378.7 | 23.04.2013 | WO2013JP61825 | Priority number, date | JP20120099972 | 25.04.2012 Original published format: JP 2012099972 | [2015/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013161783 | Date: | 31.10.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2860589 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G03H1/00, B44C1/17, B42D15/00 | [2015/16] | CPC: |
G03H1/0011 (EP,US);
B42D25/00 (US);
B42D25/24 (EP,US);
B42D25/309 (EP,US);
B42D25/328 (EP,US);
B42D25/455 (EP,US);
B42D25/46 (EP,US);
B44C1/17 (US);
G03H1/0236 (EP,US);
G03H1/0252 (EP,US);
G03H1/0244 (EP,US);
G03H1/265 (EP,US);
G03H2001/0016 (EP,US);
G03H2001/0497 (EP,US);
G03H2210/54 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/16] | Title | German: | HOLOGRAMMTRANSKRIPTIONSFOLIE, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BILDANZEIGEELEMENTS, BILDANZEIGEELEMENT UND PERSÖNLICHES AUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSMEDIUM | [2015/16] | English: | HOLOGRAM TRANSCRIPTION FOIL, METHOD FOR PRODUCING IMAGE DISPLAY ELEMENT, IMAGE DISPLAY ELEMENT, AND PERSONAL AUTHENTICATION MEDIUM | [2015/16] | French: | FEUILLE DE TRANSCRIPTION D'HOLOGRAMME, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN ÉLÉMENT D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGE, ÉLÉMENT D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGE, ET SUPPORT D'AUTHENTIFICATION PERSONNEL | [2015/16] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2014 | Translation filed | 31.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2014 | Search fee paid | 31.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/16] | 17.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0778801 (KURZ LEONHARD FA [DE]) [A] 1,5* figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2008272883 (TODA TOSHIKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,5 * paragraphs [0037] - [0086]; figures 1-7 *; | [XI]JP2012068537 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1,3-9 * paragraphs [0048] - [0220]; figures 1-12 * [I] 2 | International search | [A]JP2002293068 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2010253829 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]JP2011221228 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [X]JP2012071477 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]JP2012076362 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2000141863 | JP2002226740 | JP2003170685 |