Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2914096

EP2914096 - CONTROL BOX UNIT FOR A MILKING STATION, AND MILKING STATION ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.04.2018
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GEA Farm Technologies GmbH
Siemensstrasse 25-27
59199 Bönen / DE
[2015/37]
Inventor(s)01 / HILLE, Dieter
Schürten 46
59302 Oelde / DE
02 / TECKENTRUP, Rolf
Paul-Keller-Str. 18
59302 Oelde / DE
 [2015/37]
Representative(s)Specht, Peter , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2015/37]
Application number, filing date13783608.629.10.2013
[2015/37]
WO2013EP72642
Priority number, dateDE20121011050002.11.2012         Original published format: DE102012110500
[2015/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014067966
Date:08.05.2014
Language:DE
[2014/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2914096
Date:09.09.2015
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2014
[2015/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.05.2014
ClassificationInternational:A01K1/12
[2015/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/37]
TitleGerman:STEUERSCHRANKEINHEIT EINES MELKSTANDS UND MELKSTANDANORDNUNG[2015/37]
English:CONTROL BOX UNIT FOR A MILKING STATION, AND MILKING STATION ARRANGEMENT[2015/37]
French:UNITÉ ARMOIRE DE COMMANDE D'UNE POSTE DE TRAITE ET ENSEMBLE POSTE DE TRAITE[2015/37]
Entry into regional phase29.05.2015National basic fee paid 
29.05.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
29.05.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/37]
08.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.04.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
24.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
23.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
26.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XYI]EP0389013  (LELY NV C VAN DER [NL]) [X] 1-3,15,17,19 * column 6, line 33 - column 7, line 15 * * column 8, lines 32-57 * * column 10, line 24 - column 11, line 37 * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 4-12 [I] 13,14,16,18,20-23;
 [Y]WO9423565  (PROLION BV [NL], et al) [Y] 4-12 * page 2, line 18 - page 3, line 11 * * figures 1-2 *;
 [A]WO0130134  (DELAVAL HOLDING AB [SE], et al) [A] 4-12 * page 3, line 25 - page 4, line 5 * * page 5, lines 5-25 * * page 7, line 1 - page 8, line 2 * * page 9, line 25 - page 11, line 6 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]WO2008154247  (HARDY JOHN P [US], et al) [A] 18,20-23 * the whole document *