Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2914410

EP2914410 - METHOD FOR INJECTING THIN PLASTIC PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.07.2018
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.08.2018  [2018/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Valeo Vision
34 rue Saint André
93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR
[2015/37]
Inventor(s)01 / BARRE, Laurent, Luc
6A rue du Foyer
F-67270 Hochfelden / FR
 [2015/37]
Representative(s)Schaffner, Jean
Valeo Vision S.A.S.
Industrial Property Dpt
34, rue Saint-André
93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR
[2015/37]
Application number, filing date13783612.829.10.2013
[2015/37]
WO2013EP72654
Priority number, dateFR2012006037930.10.2012         Original published format: FR 1260379
[2015/37]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014067973
Date:08.05.2014
Language:FR
[2014/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2914410
Date:09.09.2015
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2014
[2015/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.05.2014
ClassificationInternational:B29C45/17, C08K5/14, B29K105/00, B29K105/06, B29K67/00, B29L31/30, B29C45/00, B29K23/00
[2015/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/37]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM EINSPRITZEN VON DÜNNEN KUNSTSTOFFTEILEN[2015/37]
English:METHOD FOR INJECTING THIN PLASTIC PARTS[2015/37]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'INJECTION DE PIÈCES MINCES EN PLASTIQUE[2015/37]
Entry into regional phase10.04.2015National basic fee paid 
10.04.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
10.04.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/37]
18.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.03.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/33]
09.04.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/33]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.10.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201705   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]JP2009249429  (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO) [X] 10-19 * paragraphs [0053] , [ 0097] - [0098] - [ 0117] , [ 0132] - [0134] - [ 0152]; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]US2006264580  (MULLEN BRIAN [US]) [X] 10-19 * figures 1-2 * * paragraphs [0073] , [ 0081] , [ 0119] - [0121] *;
 [X]US5298211  (HAMANAKA TATSUO [JP] ET AL) [X] 10-19 * figure 1; example 2 * * column 1, lines 44-46 * * column 5, lines 4-39 * * column 6, lines 33-49 * * column 7, lines 7-17 *;
 [X]US4734448  (KASAHARA TOSHIKAZU [JP] ET AL) [X] 10-19 * column 1, lines 6-10; examples 12-18 *;
 [I]US2011250457  (OOTA KENJI [JP] ET AL) [I] 10-19 * paragraphs [0002] , [ 0016] * * paragraphs [0087] - [0088] - [ 0129] * * abstract *;
 [I]US2005261443  (BOUHELAL SAID [US]) [I] 1-9 * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraphs [0015] - [0019] * * abstract *;
 [I]US4578430  (DAVISON SOL [US]) [I] 1-9 * column 1, line 14 - line 23 * * column 5, line 20 - column 6, line 53 * * example illustratif; tables 1, 2 *;
 [I]  - "Peroxides in polypropylene", (20090618), URL: http://www.specialchem4polymers.com/common/shared/ctl/displayfile.aspx?id=1406, (20140204), XP055100061 [I] 1-9 * the whole document *