Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2845337

EP2845337 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING/RECEIVING CONTROL CHANNEL IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.11.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[2015/11]
Inventor(s)01 / JI, Hyoung Ju
No. 107-702 Jamsil Els Apt.
Jamsil 2-dong
Songpa-gu
Seoul 138-222 / KR
02 / KIM, Youn Sun
No. 103-803 Parktown Daerim Apt.
Sunae-dong
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-020 / KR
03 / CHO, Joon Young
No. 6118-601 Gwanggyo E-Pyeonhansesang Apt.
Iui-dong
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-270 / KR
04 / LEE, Ju Ho
No. 728-801 Salgugol Hyundai 7 Danji Apt.
Yeongtong 2-dong
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-472 / KR
 [2015/11]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[2018/16]
Former [2015/11]Jenkins, Richard Gavin
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date13784256.330.04.2013
[2018/16]
WO2013KR03760
Priority number, dateUS201261640111P30.04.2012         Original published format: US 201261640111 P
KR2013004649726.04.2013         Original published format: KR 20130046497
[2015/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013165170
Date:07.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2845337
Date:11.03.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2013
[2015/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2845337
Date:18.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR07.11.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L5/00
[2015/51]
Former International [2015/11]H04J11/00, H04B7/26
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/11]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SENDEN/EMPFANGEN EINES STEUERKANALS IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2015/11]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING/RECEIVING CONTROL CHANNEL IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2015/11]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR LA TRANSMISSION ET LA RÉCEPTION D'UN CANAL DE COMMANDE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL[2015/11]
Entry into regional phase23.10.2014National basic fee paid 
23.10.2014Search fee paid 
23.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
23.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/11]
08.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.04.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.03.2018Fee for grant paid
07.03.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.12.2016
Opposition(s)21.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SI18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
IE30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
LU30.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/19]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
IE30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
LU30.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
LU30.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
LU30.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/09]AL18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
LU30.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/08]AL18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
LU30.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/03]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2018/52]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
Former [2018/51]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/49]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/47]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/46]AL18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NO18.07.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2011093671  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]; KIM HAKSEONG [KR]; LEE DAEWON [KR]; SEO HANBY) [X] 1-4,6-9,11-14 * page 43, line 4 - page 46, line 5 * * page 52 - page 53; figure 25A *
 [X]  - ZTE, "Discussion on DMRS for enhanced PDCCH", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-121051 DISCUSSION ON DMRS FOR ENHANCED PDCCH, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120320), vol. RAN WG1, no. Jeju, Korea, XP050599354 [X] 1,2,4-7,9-12,14,15 * figure 1 *
International search[X]US2012057519  (HAKSEONG KIM ET AL.);
 [Y]  - ZTE, "Discussion on DMRS for enhanced PDCCH", R1-121051, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 MEETING #68BIS, JEJU, KOREA, (20120326), URL: http://isearch.3gpp.org/isysquery/beaff237-32ef-4545-8ab1-cff674b6a3b7/3/doc/, XP050599354
 [A]  - LG ELECTRONICS INC., "R-PDCCH REG mapping", R1-106136, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 MEETING #63, JACKSONVILLE, USA, (20101115), XP050489596
 [A]  - SAMSUNG, "R-PDCCH REG/CCE mapping onto PRBs", R1-105403, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #62BIS, XIAN, CHINA, (20101011), XP050450544
 [A]  - NTT DOCOMO, "Resource Mapping Scheme for E-PDCCH", R1-121477, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 MEETING #68BIS, JEJU, KOREA, (20120326), XP050599758