Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2844290

EP2844290 - NOVEL ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.07.2018
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.10.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.07.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.08.2018  [2018/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
251 Little Falls Drive
Wilmington, DE 19808 / US
[2017/40]
Former [2015/11]For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Corporation Service Company
2711 Centerville Road, Suite 400
Wilmington DE 19808 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TAYLOR, Alexander, Harrison
c/o Glaxosmithkline
709 Swedeland Road
King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US
02 / WHITE, John, Richard
c/o GlaxoSmithKline
709 Swedeland Road
King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US
03 / XUE, Yu
c/o GlaxoSmithKline
709 Swedeland Road
King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US
 [2015/11]
Representative(s)Chiappinelli, Susan Ann , et al
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/11]Sayce, Alastair George , et al
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Application number, filing date13784908.901.05.2013
WO2013US38991
Priority number, dateUS201261640796P01.05.2012         Original published format: US 201261640796 P
[2015/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013166099
Date:07.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2844290
Date:11.03.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2013
[2015/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.11.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/395, C07K16/24, C07K16/18, A61K39/00
[2015/50]
Former International [2015/11]A61K39/395
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/11]
Extension statesBA17.11.2014
ME17.11.2014
TitleGerman:NEUARTIGE ANTIKÖRPER[2015/11]
English:NOVEL ANTIBODIES[2015/11]
French:NOUVEAUX ANTICORPS[2015/11]
Entry into regional phase17.11.2014National basic fee paid 
17.11.2014Search fee paid 
17.11.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.11.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/11]
09.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.02.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/32]
26.03.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2018/32]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.12.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
08.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201806   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2009149189  (ABBOTT LAB [US]; GHAYUR TARIQ [US]; ISAKSON PETER C [US]; OLSON LISA M) [Y] 1-8 * claim 1 * * page 67, lines 4-6 *;
 [XY]US2008262203  (CLEGG STEPHANIE JANE [GB] ET AL) [X] 8 * paragraph [0185]; sequences 46,62 * * paragraphs [0156] - [0159] * * paragraph [0085] * [Y] 1-7;
 [Y]  - SALFELD JOCHEN G, "Isotype selection in antibody engineering", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, UNITED STATES, (20071201), vol. 25, no. 12, ISSN 1546-1696, pages 1369 - 1372, XP002668461 [Y] 1-8 * page 1371, column m, paragraph 2 * * page 1371, column m, paragraph 3 - column r, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1207-1369
 [Y]  - REDDY M P ET AL, "Elimination of Fc receptor-dependent effector functions of a modified IgG4 monoclonal antibody to human CD4", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF IMMUNOLOGISTS, US, (20000215), vol. 164, no. 4, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 1925 - 1933, XP002612595 [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * figure 1 * * page 1925, column r, paragraph 2 - page 1926, column l, paragraph 1 *
 [Y]  - SUITTERS A J ET AL, "DIFFERENTIAL EFFECT OF ISOTYPE ON EFFICACY OF ANTI-TUMOR NECROSIS FACTOR ALPHA-CHIMERIC ANTIBODIES IN EXPERIMENTAL SEPTIC SHOCK", THE JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, ROCKEFELLER UNIVERSITY PRESS, US, (19940301), vol. 179, no. 3, doi:10.1084/JEM.179.3.849, ISSN 0022-1007, pages 849 - 856, XP000655181 [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * page 850, column l, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 853, column r, paragraph 1 * * page 854, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 854, column r, paragraph 1 * * page 854, column r, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.179.3.849
 [A]  - ISAACS J D ET AL, "A THERAPEUTIC HUMAN IGG4 MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY THAT DEPLETES TARGET CELLS IN HUMANS", CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL IMMUNOLOGY, WILEY-BLACKWELL PUBLISHING LTD, GB, (19961201), vol. 106, no. 3, doi:10.1046/J.1365-2249.1996.D01-876.X, ISSN 0009-9104, pages 427 - 433, XP001106342 [A] 1-8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2249.1996.d01-876.x
 [A]  - WARNCKE MAX ET AL, "Different Adaptations of IgG Effector Function in Human and Nonhuman Primates and Implications for Therapeutic Antibody Treatment", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (20120328), vol. 188, no. 9, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 4405 - 4411, XP002745516 [A] 1-8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.1200090
 [A]  - S. MAIN ET AL, "A Potent Human Anti-Eotaxin1 Antibody, CAT-213: Isolation by Phage Display and in Vitro and in Vivo Efficacy", JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL THERAPEUTICS, (20061201), vol. 319, no. 3, doi:10.1124/jpet.106.110734, ISSN 0022-3565, pages 1395 - 1404, XP055053944 [A] 1-8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/jpet.106.110734
 [A]  - CO M S ET AL, "Properties and pharmacokinetics of two humanized antibodies specific for L-selectin", IMMUNOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, NL, (19990301), vol. 4, no. 3-4, doi:10.1016/S1380-2933(98)00024-4, ISSN 1380-2933, pages 253 - 266, XP004163552 [A] 1-8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1380-2933(98)00024-4
International search[A]US2008262203  (CLEGG STEPHANIE JANE [GB], et al);
 [A]US2006104971  (GARBER ELLEN [US], et al);
 [A]US2011229475  (CLEGG STEPHANIE JANE [GB], et al)
by applicantWO2008130969
 WO9834640
 WO9711086
 WO9013646
    - KOUMENIS et al., Int. J. Pharmaceut., (20000000), vol. 198, pages 83 - 95
    - POLLOCK et al., J. Immunol. Methods, (19990000), vol. 231, pages 147 - 157
    - MORROW, Genet. Eng. News, (20000000), vol. 20, pages 1 - 55
    - DORAN, Curr. Opinion Biotechnol., (20000000), vol. 11, pages 199 - 204
    - MA, Nat. Med., (19980000), vol. 4, pages 601 - 606
    - BAEZ et al., BioPharm, (20000000), vol. 13, pages 50 - 54
    - STOGER et al., Plant Mol. Biol., (20000000), vol. 42, pages 583 - 590
    - NAKAMURA et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (19960000), vol. 24, pages 214 - 215
    - HOEKEMA et al., Mol Cell Biol, (19870000), vol. 7, no. 8, pages 2914 - 24