Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2844155

EP2844155 - SURGICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.09.2018
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.04.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 08.05.2019  [2019/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZSX Medical, LLC
530 D. South Henderson Road
King Of Prussia, PA 19406 / US
[2015/11]
Inventor(s)01 / MAZZUCCO, Dan
407 Hillside Avenue
Haddon Heights, NJ 08035 / US
02 / CARGILL, Bob
1207 Royal Lane
West Deptford, NJ 08086 / US
03 / KENT, Todd J.
5 Heather Lane
Cherry Hill, NJ 08003 / US
04 / REED, David, George
2735 Arrowhead Drive
Langhorne, PA 19053 / US
05 / VU, Binh, Bao
3000 Ford Road
Unit C26
Bristol, PA 19007 / US
 [2015/11]
Representative(s)Petraz, Gilberto Luigi , et al
GLP S.r.l.
Viale Europa Unita, 171
33100 Udine / IT
[2015/11]
Application number, filing date13784947.718.04.2013
[2017/46]
WO2013US37152
Priority number, dateUS201261640306P30.04.2012         Original published format: US 201261640306 P
US20131383296715.03.2013         Original published format: US201313832967
[2015/18]
Former [2015/11]US201261640306P30.04.2012
US20131383296703.03.2013
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013165698
Date:07.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2844155
Date:11.03.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2013
[2015/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2844155
Date:15.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:RU07.11.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.04.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/08, A61B17/122
[2016/03]
Former International [2015/11]A61B17/08, A61B17/03
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/11]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:CHIRURGISCHE VORRICHTUNG[2015/11]
English:SURGICAL DEVICE[2015/11]
French:DISPOSITIF CHIRURGICAL[2015/11]
Entry into regional phase19.11.2014National basic fee paid 
19.11.2014Search fee paid 
19.11.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
19.11.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/11]
21.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.10.2017Fee for grant paid
04.10.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.10.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP16173225.0  / EP3087932
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.05.2017
Opposition(s)17.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
IE18.04.2018
LU18.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
[2019/19]
Former [2019/12]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
LU18.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
Former [2019/08]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
LU18.04.2018
Former [2018/52]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/22]FI15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
NO15.02.2018
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2005216036  (NAKAO NAOMI L [US]) [X] 1,3,4,9,13,14 * figures 1, 13, 14 * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0087] * [Y] 2,5,6;
 [YA]US2008300628  (ELLINGWOOD BRIAN A [US]) [Y] 2,5,6 * figure 1A * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0072] * [A] 1;
 [X]US2008004637  (KLASSEN JAMES B [CA], et al) [X] 1,13 * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0082] *;
 [A]EP0714633  (ETHICON INC [US]) [A] 1,2,5,6 * column 1, line 5 - line 8 * * column 4, line 18 - line 28 *
International search[X]WO2010126751  (WILSON COOK MEDICAL INC [US], et al);
 [Y]US2004193185  (MCBRAYER MICHAEL SEAN [US]);
 [Y]US2011112559  (MONASSEVITCH LEONID [IL], et al);
 [Y]US2011264118  (MAZZUCCO DAN [US], et al)