Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2907295

EP2907295 - WIRELESS AREA NETWORK ENABLED MOBILE DEVICE ACCESSORY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.04.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.04.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.11.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.11.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.06.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2015/34]
Inventor(s)01 / ALTMAN, Steven R.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2015/34]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2019/21]
Former [2015/34]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date13785711.615.10.2013
[2015/34]
WO2013US65103
Priority number, dateUS201261714011P15.10.2012         Original published format: US 201261714011 P
US20131405344114.10.2013         Original published format: US201314053441
[2015/42]
Former [2015/34]US201261714011P15.10.2012
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014062714
Date:24.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2907295
Date:19.08.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2014
[2015/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2907295
Date:22.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04M1/725, H04B1/3827
[2018/27]
Former International [2015/34]H04M1/725, H04B1/38
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/34]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZUBEHÖR EINER WAN-AKTIVIERTEN MOBILEN VORRICHTUNG[2015/34]
English:WIRELESS AREA NETWORK ENABLED MOBILE DEVICE ACCESSORY[2015/34]
French:ACCESSOIRE DE DISPOSITIF MOBILE ACTIVÉ PAR UN RÉSEAU SANS FIL ÉTENDU[2015/34]
Entry into regional phase09.04.2015National basic fee paid 
09.04.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
09.04.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.07.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/34]
09.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.10.2018Fee for grant paid
29.10.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.10.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
23.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.03.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
10.04.2019Information about intention to grant a patent
10.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP18206716.5  / EP3462720
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.11.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
07.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
10.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
08.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL22.05.2019
ES22.05.2019
FI22.05.2019
HR22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
LV22.05.2019
NL22.05.2019
RS22.05.2019
SE22.05.2019
BG22.08.2019
NO22.08.2019
GR23.08.2019
PT22.09.2019
[2019/51]
Former [2019/50]AL22.05.2019
ES22.05.2019
FI22.05.2019
HR22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
LV22.05.2019
NL22.05.2019
RS22.05.2019
SE22.05.2019
NO22.08.2019
GR23.08.2019
PT22.09.2019
Former [2019/49]AL22.05.2019
ES22.05.2019
FI22.05.2019
HR22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
NL22.05.2019
SE22.05.2019
NO22.08.2019
PT22.09.2019
Former [2019/48]ES22.05.2019
FI22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
SE22.05.2019
NO22.08.2019
PT22.09.2019
Former [2019/47]ES22.05.2019
FI22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
NO22.08.2019
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2010203905  (CHAUBEY NISHITH [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,4,6-8 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0070] * * figures 1,5 * [Y] 14-21,26-33,38-45,48-51,54-57 [I] 3,5,9-13,22-25,34-37,46,47,52,53;
 [XI]US2006087993  (SENGUPTA UTTAM K [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,7 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0030] * * figure 1 * [I] 3-6,8-12,22-25,34-37,46,47,52,53;
 [Y]US2004102931  (ELLIS MICHAEL D [US] ET AL ELLIS MICHAEL [US] ET AL) [Y] 14-21,26-33,38-45,48-51,54-57 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0178] - paragraph [0180] * * paragraph [0255] - paragraph [0257] * * paragraph [0274] * * paragraph [0297] - paragraph [0298] * * paragraph [0327] - paragraph [0328] * * figures 22a,22b *