Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2879571

EP2879571 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR EXTRACTING PHYSIOLOGICAL INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.10.2018
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/24]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / SHAN, Caifeng
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / KIRENKO, Ihor Olehovych
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2015/24]
Representative(s)Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/24]Steffen, Thomas
Philips International B.V.
Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date13785910.426.07.2013
WO2013IB56141
Priority number, dateUS201261678653P02.08.2012         Original published format: US 201261678653 P
[2015/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014020509
Date:06.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2879571
Date:10.06.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2014
[2015/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/00, A61B5/113, A61B5/08, A61B5/024, A61B5/11, G06T7/20
[2015/24]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/24]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM EXTRAHIEREN PHYSIOLOGISCHER DATEN[2015/24]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR EXTRACTING PHYSIOLOGICAL INFORMATION[2015/24]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR EXTRAIRE DES INFORMATIONS PHYSIOLOGIQUES[2015/24]
Entry into regional phase02.03.2015National basic fee paid 
02.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
02.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/24]
08.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.10.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
01.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
31.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2010100594  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 7, line 13 - page 8, line 20 * * page 9, line 1 - page 10, line 26 * * figure -; claim - *;
 [X]WO2011042858  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,8-13,15 * page 7, line 1 - page 8, line 25 * * page 10, line 1 - page 12, line 24 * * page 15, line 4 - page 18, line 29 * * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US2012116202  (BANGERA MAHALAXMI GITA [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0031] - [0032] * * paragraphs [0042] - [0044] * * paragraphs [0058] - [0062] *;
 [AD]US2010061596  (MOSTAFAVI HASSAN [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantUS2010061596