EP2846632 - CONTAINED SYSTEMS TO PROVIDE REPRODUCTIVE HABITAT FOR HERMETIA ILLUCENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/12] | CONTAINED SYSTEMS TO PROVIDE REPRODUCTIVE HABITAT FOR HERMETIA ILLUCENSSYSTÈMES CONFINÉS CONSTITUANT UN LIEU DE REPRODUCTION POUR HERMETIA ILLUCENS | ||
[2017/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enterra Feed Corporation 134-887 Great Northern Way Vancouver, British Columbia V5T 4T5 / CA | [2017/13] |
Former [2015/12] | For all designated states Enterra Feed Corporation 134-887 Great Northern Way Vancouver, British Columiba V5T 4T5 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALDANA, Juan 4276 Dieppe Rd. Victoria, British Columbia V8X 2N3 / CA | 02 /
QUAN, Edna 6615 Culloden St Vancouver, British Columbia V5X 4J3 / CA | 03 /
VICKERSON, Andrew 741 E 11th Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V5T 2E4 / CA | 04 /
MARCHANT, Brad Suite 2502 - 428 Beach Crescent Vancouver, British Columbia V6Z 3G1 / CA | 05 /
KAULFUSS, Oliver 222 Anthony Court New Westminster, British Columbia V3L 5T5 / CA | 06 /
RADLEY, Reed 898 West 17th Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V5Z 1V1 / CA | [2015/12] | Representative(s) | Michalík, Andrej, et al De Clercq & Partners cvba E. Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [2017/32] |
Former [2015/12] | De Clercq, Ann G. Y., et al De Clercq & Partners Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | Application number, filing date | 13787121.6 | 07.05.2013 | [2017/32] | WO2013CA00457 | Priority number, date | US201261643728P | 07.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261643728 P | [2015/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013166590 | Date: | 14.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2846632 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2846632 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 14.11.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A01K67/033, C12M1/42, C12M3/00 | [2015/12] | CPC: |
A01K67/033 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GESCHLOSSENE SYSTEME ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINER REPRODUKTIONSUMGEBUNG FÜR HERMETIA ILLUCENS | [2015/12] | English: | CONTAINED SYSTEMS TO PROVIDE REPRODUCTIVE HABITAT FOR HERMETIA ILLUCENS | [2017/13] | French: | SYSTÈMES CONFINÉS CONSTITUANT UN LIEU DE REPRODUCTION POUR HERMETIA ILLUCENS | [2015/12] |
Former [2015/12] | CONTAINED SYSTEMS TO PROVIDE REPRODUCTIVE HABITAT FOR HERMETIA ILLUCENSSYSTÈMES CONFINÉS CONSTITUANT UN LIEU DE REPRODUCTION POUR HERMETIA ILLUCENS | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2014 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/12] | 10.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.05.2013 | AL | 09.08.2017 | AT | 09.08.2017 | CY | 09.08.2017 | CZ | 09.08.2017 | EE | 09.08.2017 | FI | 09.08.2017 | HR | 09.08.2017 | LT | 09.08.2017 | LV | 09.08.2017 | MC | 09.08.2017 | MK | 09.08.2017 | PT | 09.08.2017 | RS | 09.08.2017 | SE | 09.08.2017 | SI | 09.08.2017 | SK | 09.08.2017 | SM | 09.08.2017 | TR | 09.08.2017 | BG | 09.11.2017 | NO | 09.11.2017 | GR | 10.11.2017 | IS | 09.12.2017 | LU | 07.05.2018 | MT | 07.05.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 07.05.2013 | |
AT | 09.08.2017 | ||
CY | 09.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
MK | 09.08.2017 | ||
PT | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 07.05.2018 | ||
MT | 07.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 07.05.2013 | |
AT | 09.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
PT | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 07.05.2018 | ||
MT | 07.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 07.05.2018 | ||
MT | 07.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 07.05.2018 | ||
MT | 07.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 07.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/06] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 09.08.2017 | |
NO | 09.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN201185612Y (UNIV HUAZHONG AGRICULTURAL [CN]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011174222 (LEE SANG HOON [KR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2015013826 (ENTERRA FEED CORP [CA]) [E] 1-15 * paragraph [0044] * | International search | [X] - ZHANG, J. ET AL., "An artificial light source influences mating and oviposition of black soldier flies, Hermetia illucens", JOURNAL OF INSECT SCIENCE, (2010), vol. 10, no. 202-1, XP055172290 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1673/031.010.20201 | [X] - "Black Soldier Fly Forum: Breeding BSF in captivity, Reply #22 ''Re: not easy'' by earthtiger", BIOPOD: THE FUTURE OF FOOD WASTE DIVERSION AND RECYCLING, (20111126), URL: http://thebiopod.com/forum/index.php?topic=175.15, (20130620), XP008176814 | [A] - TOMBERLIN, J.K. ET AL., "Factors influencing mating and oviposition of black soldier flies (Diptera: Stratiomyidae) in a colony", JOURNAL OF ENTOMOLOGICAL SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 37, no. 4, pages 345 - 352, XP055172294 | by applicant | CN201185612Y | - ZHANG, J. ET AL., JOURNAL OF INSECT SCIENCE, (2010), vol. 10, no. 202, pages 1 - 7 | - BRADLEY, S. W.; SHEPPARD, D. C., "House Fly Oviposition Inhibition by Larvae of Hermetia illucens, the Black Soldier Fly", JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL ECOLOGY, (1984), vol. 19, page 853 | - ERICKSON, M. C.; M. ISLAM; C. SHEPPARD; J. LIAO; M. P. DOYLE, "Reduction of Eschericia coli 0157:H7 and Salmonella enterica serovar Enteritidis in chicken manure by larvae of the black soldier fly", J. FOOD PROTECTION, (2004), vol. 67, pages 685 - 690 | - FURMAN, D. P.; R. D. YOUNG; E. P. CATTS, "Hermetia illucens (Linnaeus) as a factor in the natural control of Musca domestica Linnaeus", J. ECON. ENTOMOL., (1959), vol. 52, pages 917 - 921 | - HOGSETTE, J. A., "New diets for production of house flies and stable flies (Diptera: Muscidae) in the laboratory", J. ECON. ENTOMOL., (1985), vol. 85, pages 2291 - 2294 | - LIU, Q.; TOMERBLIN, J. K.; BRADY, J. A.; SANFORD, M. R.; YU, Z., "Black Soldier Fly (Diptera: Stratiomyidae) Larvae Reduce Escherichia coli in Dairy Manure", ENVIRON. ENTOMOL., (2008), vol. 37, no. 6, pages 1525 - 1530 | - SHEPPARD, D.C J.K.; J.K. TOMBERLIN; J.A. JOYCE; B.C. KISER; S.M. SUMNER, "Rearing Methods for the Black Soldier Fly (Diptera: Stratiomyidae", J. MED. ENTOMOL., (2002), vol. 39, no. 4, pages 695 - 698 | - TOMBERLIN, J. K.; ALDER, P. H.; MYERS H. M., "Development of the Black Soldier Fly (Diptera: Stratiomyidae) in Relation to Temperature", ENVIRON. ENTOMOL., (2009), vol. 38, pages 930 - 934 | - TOMBERLIN, J.K.; D.C. SHEPPARD, "Factors Influencing Mating and Oviposition of Black Soldier Flies (Diptera: Stratiomyidae) in a Colony", J. ENTOMOL. SCI., (2002), vol. 37, no. 4, pages 345 - 352 | - TOMBERLIN, J.K.; D. C. SHEPPARD; J.A. JOYCE, "Selected Life-History Traits of Black Soldier Flies (Diptera: Stratiomyidae) Reared on Three Artificial Diets", ANN. ENTOMOL. SOC. AM., (2002), vol. 95, no. 3, pages 379 - 386 | - ZHANG ET AL., "An artificial light source influences mating and oviposition of black soldier flies", HERMETIA ILLUCENS. J. INSECT SCI., (2010), vol. 10, pages 1 - 7 |