Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2847891

EP2847891 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR UPLINK TIMING ALIGNMENT IN SYSTEM WITH LARGE NUMBER OF ANTENNAS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.03.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.03.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PL
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[2015/12]
Inventor(s)01 / SINGH, Jaspreet
4250 E. Renner Rd. Apt 1628
Richardson, Texas 75082 / US
02 / PI, Zhouyue
1051 Hot Springs Drive
Allen, Texas 75013 / US
03 / LI, Ying
3500 North Star Road 126
Richardson, Texas 75082 / US
 [2015/12]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[2019/17]
Former [2015/12]Jenkins, Richard Gavin
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date13787653.809.05.2013
[2019/17]
WO2013KR04091
Priority number, dateUS201261646077P11.05.2012         Original published format: US 201261646077 P
US201261651397P24.05.2012         Original published format: US 201261651397 P
US20131387284429.04.2013         Original published format: US201313872844
[2015/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013169036
Date:14.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2847891
Date:18.03.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2013
[2015/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2847891
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR14.11.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W56/00
[2016/01]
Former International [2015/12]H04B7/26, H04B7/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/12]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR UPLINK-ZEITANPASSUNG IN EINEM SYSTEM MIT EINER GROSSEN ANZAHL VON ANTENNEN[2015/12]
English:METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR UPLINK TIMING ALIGNMENT IN SYSTEM WITH LARGE NUMBER OF ANTENNAS[2015/12]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL D'ALIGNEMENT TEMPOREL DE LIAISON MONTANTE DANS UN SYSTÈME MUNI D'UN GRAND NOMBRE D'ANTENNES[2015/12]
Entry into regional phase17.10.2014National basic fee paid 
17.10.2014Search fee paid 
17.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/12]
27.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.12.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.02.2019Fee for grant paid
27.02.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.03.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
15.03.2019Information about intention to grant a patent
15.03.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.12.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
04.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
10.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
23.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL24.04.2019
ES24.04.2019
FI24.04.2019
HR24.04.2019
LT24.04.2019
LV24.04.2019
PL24.04.2019
RS24.04.2019
SE24.04.2019
BG24.07.2019
NO24.07.2019
GR25.07.2019
PT24.08.2019
[2019/52]
Former [2019/51]AL24.04.2019
ES24.04.2019
FI24.04.2019
HR24.04.2019
LT24.04.2019
LV24.04.2019
RS24.04.2019
SE24.04.2019
BG24.07.2019
NO24.07.2019
GR25.07.2019
PT24.08.2019
Former [2019/50]AL24.04.2019
ES24.04.2019
FI24.04.2019
HR24.04.2019
LT24.04.2019
LV24.04.2019
RS24.04.2019
SE24.04.2019
NO24.07.2019
GR25.07.2019
PT24.08.2019
Former [2019/49]AL24.04.2019
ES24.04.2019
FI24.04.2019
HR24.04.2019
LT24.04.2019
SE24.04.2019
NO24.07.2019
PT24.08.2019
Former [2019/48]ES24.04.2019
FI24.04.2019
LT24.04.2019
SE24.04.2019
NO24.07.2019
PT24.08.2019
Former [2019/47]ES24.04.2019
FI24.04.2019
LT24.04.2019
NO24.07.2019
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2012041422  (PANASONIC CORP [JP]; LOEHR JOACHIM [DE]; WENGERTER CHRISTIAN [DE]; FEU) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * page 57, line 27 - page 62, line 17 * [I] 5-15;
 [I]  - RENESAS MOBILE EUROPE, "Discussion on RACH based solution and Timing difference based solution", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-113015 DISCUSSION ON RACH BASED SOLUTION AND TA CALCULATION BASED SOLUTION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110502), vol. RAN WG2, no. Barcelona, Spain; 20110509, XP050495153 [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0004]; figure 1 *
 [I]  - HUAWEI ET AL, "the Multiple Time Advances in Carrier Aggregation", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-111953 THE MULTIPLE TIME ADVANCES IN CARRIER AGGREGATION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110405), vol. RAN WG2, no. Shanghai, China; 20110411, XP050494488 [I] 1-15 * paragraph [02.1] *
International search[A]US2011310861  (JIA YONGKANG [CA], et al);
 [A]US2006040706  (WU SHIQUAN [CA], et al);
 [A]US2011249550  (LUZ YEHUDA Y [US], et al);
 [A]US2008085715  (ALM MARTIN [SE], et al)
 [A]  - HUAWEI ET AL., "Uplink timing advance for CoMP", R1-120991, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 MEETING #68BIS, JEJU, KOREA, (20120326), pages 1 - 4, XP050599302
by applicantWO2012041422
    - R2-113015 DISCUSSION ON RACH BASED SOLUTION AND TA CALCULATION BASED SOLUTION, vol. RAN WG2
    - HUAWEI ET AL., R2-111953 THE MULTIPLE TIME ADVANCES IN CARRIER AGGREGATION, MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE, vol. RAN WG2