EP2847364 - FORMULATIONS FOR WET ETCHING NIPT DURING SILICIDE FABRICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.10.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Entegris, Inc. 7, Commerce Drive Danbury, CT 06810 / US | [2015/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Tianniu 35 Russell's Way Westford, MA 01886 / US | 02 /
BILODEAU, Steven M. 20 Carriage Drive Oxford, Connecticut 06478 / US | 03 /
COOPER, Emanuel I. 25 Atherstone Road Scarsdale, New York 10583 / US | 04 /
CHEN, Li-Min 77 N Water Street C405 Norwalk, Connecticut 06854 / US | 05 /
BARNES, Jeffrey A. 2 Tulip Tree Lane Bethlehem, Connecticut 06751 / US | 06 /
BISCOTTO, Mark 7 Commerce Drive Danbury, Connecticut 06810 / US | 07 /
BOGGS, Karl E. 74 Carol Drive Hopewell Junction, New York 12533 / US | 08 /
RAJARAM, Rekha 15 Banks Street 114i White Plains, New York 10606 / US | [2015/12] | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2015/12] | ABG Patentes, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 13787810.4 | 10.05.2013 | WO2013US40517 | Priority number, date | US201261645990P | 11.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261645990 P | US201261680047P | 06.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261680047 P | US201361804443P | 22.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361804443 P | [2015/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013170130 | Date: | 14.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2847364 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.11.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C23F1/08, H01L21/302 | [2015/12] | CPC: |
H01L21/32134 (EP,US);
C23F1/28 (EP,US);
C23F1/30 (US);
C23F1/44 (EP,US);
H01L21/28518 (EP,US);
H01L21/02068 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/12] | Title | German: | FORMULIERUNGEN ZUR NASSÄTZUNG VON NIPT WÄHREND DER SILICIDHERSTELLUNG | [2015/12] | English: | FORMULATIONS FOR WET ETCHING NIPT DURING SILICIDE FABRICATION | [2015/12] | French: | FORMULATIONS DESTINÉES À LA GRAVURE HUMIDE DU NIPT PENDANT LA FABRICATION DE SILICIURE | [2015/12] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 10.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/12] | 26.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/45] | 03.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2012125401 (FUJIFILM ELECTRONIC MATERIALS [US], et al) [XP] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [XP]WO2013059806 (FUJIFILM ELECTRONIC MATERIALS [US]) [XP] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2014178426 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [E] 1-7 * page 97, paragraph 76 - page 99, paragraph 179; examples 101-134; table 21 *; | [E]WO2014039186 (FUJIFILM ELECTRONIC MATERIALS [US], et al) [E] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO2008061258 (SACHEM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-13 * the whole document * [Y] 8-13; | [XY]WO2012017819 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7 * page 14; example 10; table 1 * [Y] 12; | [XY]US2008315322 (OBENG YAW S [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7 * page 1, paragraph 12 - page 2, paragraph 19 * * claims 1-17 * [Y] 9,12; | [XY]US2007254479 (FANG SUNFEI [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7 * page 1, paragraph 9 - page 2, paragraph 22 * * page 3, paragraphs 39-41 * * page 4, paragraph 44 - page 5, paragraph 55 * * page 5, paragraph 59 * * claims 1-35 * [Y] 9,10,12; | [Y]US4556449 (NELSON NORVELL J [US]) [Y] 8-13 * column 1, lines 4-7, 26-56 * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 17 * * column 3, lines 7-39 * * examples 2, 4-6 *; | [A]DE10039684 (MEC CO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [X]WO2012017819 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP], et al); | [A]JP2012077314 (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD); | [A]KR20090012953 (CHEIL IND INC [KR]); | [A]KR20080044423 (DONGWOO FINE CHEM CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2009032766 (RAJARATNAM MARTHA M [US], et al) |