Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2848642

EP2848642 - RUBBER SHEET, PNEUMATIC TIRE USING SAME, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING RUBBER SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2015/12]For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KITANO, Hideki
c/o Bridgestone Corporation
Technical Center
3-1-1, Ogawahigashi-cho, Kodaira-shi
Tokyo 187-8531 / JP
02 / CHIASHI, Hideyuki
c/o Bridgestone Corporation
Technical Center
3-1-1, Ogawahigashi-cho, Kodaira-shi
Tokyo 187-8541 / JP
03 / AMAMOTO, Tetsuo
c/o Bridgestone Corporation
Technical Center
3-1-1, Ogawahigashi-cho, Kodaira-shi
Tokyo 187-8531 / JP
 [2015/12]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/12]Bublak, Wolfgang
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date13787840.102.05.2013
WO2013JP62770
Priority number, dateJP2012010691708.05.2012         Original published format: JP 2012106917
JP2012010691808.05.2012         Original published format: JP 2012106918
[2015/12]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013168676
Date:14.11.2013
Language:JA
[2013/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2848642
Date:18.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.11.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:C08J5/18, C08L9/00, B32B25/16
[2016/04]
Former International [2015/12]C08J5/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/12]
TitleGerman:GUMMIPLATTE, LUFTREIFEN DAMIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER GUMMIPLATTE[2015/12]
English:RUBBER SHEET, PNEUMATIC TIRE USING SAME, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING RUBBER SHEET[2015/12]
French:FEUILLE DE CAOUTCHOUC, PNEU L'UTILISANT ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE FEUILLE DE CAOUTCHOUC[2015/12]
Entry into regional phase29.10.2014Translation filed 
29.10.2014National basic fee paid 
29.10.2014Search fee paid 
29.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
29.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/12]
27.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.03.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
20.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
23.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
25.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP1892094  (NORDENIA TECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,9 * paragraphs [0005] , [0014] , [0018]; examples 2,5 * [A] 6-8,10-15;
 [XAI]EP2415617  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [X] 1-7,10,12-14 * paragraphs [0005] , [00 7] , [0 13] , [0129] - [0131]; examples 1,2; table 3 * [A] 15 [I] 8,9,11
International search[X]JP2005247969  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD);
 [X]JP2010100675  (KANEKA CORP);
 [X]JP2011213945  (BRIDGESTONE CORP);
 [A]JP2009132379  (BRIDGESTONE CORP)
by applicantJPH1110779
 JP2008120093
 JP2011105066