EP2847354 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR PROVIDING A PREECLAMPSIA ASSESSMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.11.2016 [2016/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University Office of the General Counsel Building 170 3rd Floor, Main Quad P.O. Box 20386 Stanford CA 94305-2038 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2015/25] | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University Office of the General Counsel Building 170 3rd Floor, Main Quad P.O. Box 20386 Stanford CA 94305-2038 / US | ||
Former [2015/24] | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University 3th Floor, Main Quad P.O. Box 20386 Stanford CA 94305-2038 / US | ||
Former [2015/12] | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University 1705 El Camino Real Palo Alto, CA 94306-1106 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUTTE, Atul J. 2020 Monterey Avenue Menlo Park California 94025 / US | 02 /
LING, Bruce Xuefeng 1400 Waverly Street Palo Alto California 94301 / US | 03 /
MILLER, Linda Liu 200 West Washington Square Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19106 / US | 04 /
MORGAN, Alexander A. Genome Technology Center 855 South California Ave. Palo Alto California 94304 / US | 05 /
CHEN, Gongxing 20-1-202 Jinshaxuefu 6 St. 25 Rd. Viasha Hangzhou Zhejiang 330016 / CN | 06 /
JI, Jun 269 Matadero Avenue Palo Alto California 94305 / US | 07 /
YANG, Ting 1711 Fumia Court San Jose California 95131 / US | [2015/14] |
Former [2015/12] | 01 /
BUTTE, Atul J. 2020 Monterey Avenue Menlo Park California 94025 / US | ||
02 /
LING, Bruce Xuefeng 1400 Waverly Street Palo Alto California 94301 / US | |||
03 /
MILLER, Linda Liu 200 West Washington Square Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19106 / US | |||
04 /
MORGAN, Alexander A. Genome Technology Center 855 South California Ave. Palo Alto California 94304 / US | |||
05 /
CHEN, Gongxing 269 Campus Drive CCSR Stanford California 94305 / US | |||
06 /
JI, Jun 269 Matadero Avenue Palo Alto California 94305 / US | |||
07 /
YANG, Ting 1711 Fumia Court San Jose California 95131 / US | Representative(s) | Sutcliffe, Nicholas Robert, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/12] | Sutcliffe, Nicholas Robert, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 13788066.2 | 07.05.2013 | WO2013US39918 | Priority number, date | US201261644254P | 08.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261644254 P | US201261731640P | 30.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261731640 P | [2015/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013169751 | Date: | 14.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2847354 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.11.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, G01N33/50 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
G01N33/689 (EP,CN,US);
C12Q1/6883 (EP,CN,US);
C12Q1/68 (GB);
G01N33/68 (GB);
G01N33/6845 (CN,US);
G16B25/00 (EP,US);
G16B25/10 (EP,CN,GB,US);
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/112 (GB);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,CN,GB,US);
G01N2333/705 (CN,US);
G01N2333/948 (CN,US);
G01N2800/368 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/12] | C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEURTEILUNG EINER PRÄEKLAMPSIE | [2015/12] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR PROVIDING A PREECLAMPSIA ASSESSMENT | [2015/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS PERMETTANT DE RÉALISER UNE ÉVALUATION DE PRÉÉCLAMPSIE | [2015/12] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2014 | Search fee paid | 04.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/12] | 10.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/47] | 03.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2007051069 (UNIV YALE [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 29 * [I] 2-14; | [XI]WO2009108073 (AUCKLAND UNISERVICES LTD [NZ], et al) [X] 1 * claim 1 * [I] 2-14; | [XI]WO2011128357 (PRONOTA NV [BE], et al) [X] 1 * claims 3, 15 * [I] 2-14; | [XI] - PECKS U ET AL, "Multifactorial Analysis of Affinity-Mass Spectrometry Data from Serum Protein Samples: A Strategy to Distinguish Patients with Preeclampsia from Matching Control Individuals", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MASS SPECTROMETRY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE INC, US, vol. 21, no. 10, ISSN 1044-0305, (20101001), pages 1699 - 1711, (20100104), XP027305273 [X] 1 * abstract * [I] 2-14 | [XI] - MARION BLUMENSTEIN ET AL, "A proteomic approach identifies early pregnancy biomarkers for preeclampsia: Novel linkages between a predisposition to preeclampsia and cardiovascular disease", PROTEOMICS, (20090601), vol. 9, no. 11, doi:10.1002/pmic.200800625, ISSN 1615-9853, pages 2929 - 2945, XP055019710 [X] 1 * tables 4-5 * [I] 2-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pmic.200800625 | [XI] - LINDA DEXLIN-MELLBY ET AL, "Tissue proteome profiling of preeclamptic placenta using recombinant antibody microarrays", PROTEOMICS - CLINICAL APPLICATIONS, DE, (20101004), vol. 4, no. 10-11, doi:10.1002/prca.201000001, ISSN 1862-8346, pages 794 - 807, XP055229749 [X] 1 * figure 1 * [I] 2-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/prca.201000001 | International search | [Y]US2008233583 (FISHER SUSAN J [US], et al); | [X]US2010267034 (LO YUK-MING DENNIS [HK], et al); | [Y]WO2011127219 (CARIS LIFE SCIENCES LUXEMBOURG HOLDINGS [LU], et al); | [XP]US2012142559 (TUYTTEN ROBIN [BE], et al); | [Y] - SCHUTZER ET AL., "Distinct Cerebrospinal Fluid Proteomes Differentiate Post-Treatment Lyme Disease from Chronic Fatigue Syndrome", PLOS ONE, (20110223), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 1 - 8, XP055065944 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0017287 |