Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3063873

EP3063873 - DRIVEN DUAL PHASE LOCK LOOP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.08.2018
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip31.08.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.10.2018  [2018/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
École Polytechnique Fédérale de Lausanne (EPFL)
EPFL-TTO
Quartier de l'innovation
Bâtiment J
1015 Lausanne / CH
[N/P]
Former [2016/36]For all designated states
Ecole Polytechnique Fédérale de Lausanne (EPFL)
EPFL-TTO
Quartier de l'innovation
Bâtiment J
1015 Lausanne / CH
Inventor(s)01 / TANNER, Steve
Rue du Village 6
CH-1435 Essert-Pittet / CH
02 / ZHAO, Yazhou
Ungererstrasse 226
80805 München / DE
03 / FARINE, Pierre-André
Rue Port-Roulant 12
CH-2000 Neuchâtel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2016/36]01 / TANNER, Steve
Rue du Village 6
CH-1435 Essert-Pittet / CH
02 / ZHAO, Yazhou
Faubourg de l'Hôpital 56
CH-2000 Neuchâtel / CH
03 / FARINE, Pierre-André
Rue Port-Roulant 12
CH-2000 Neuchâtel / CH
Representative(s)e-Patent SA
Rue Saint-Honoré 1
2000 Neuchâtel / CH
[2016/36]
Application number, filing date13789233.731.10.2013
[2016/36]
WO2013EP72847
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015062663
Date:07.05.2015
Language:FR
[2015/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3063873
Date:07.09.2016
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2015
[2016/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:H03L7/113, H03L7/087
[2016/36]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/36]
TitleGerman:ANGETRIEBENER DOPPELPHASENREGELKREIS[2016/36]
English:DRIVEN DUAL PHASE LOCK LOOP[2016/36]
French:BOUCLE A VERROUILLAGE DE PHASE DUALE ET PILOTEE[2016/36]
Entry into regional phase27.05.2016National basic fee paid 
27.05.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
27.05.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.05.2016Examination requested  [2016/36]
01.05.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/40]
30.05.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201603   M06   Fee paid on   06.06.2016
31.10.201705   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[I]US2010195779  (SAI AKIHIDE [JP]) [I] 1-9 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0045]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0059]; figure 6 *;
 [A]EP2629424  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [I]  - XIAOLEI GAI ET AL, "A 35 GHz dual-loop PLL with low phase noise and fast lock for millimeter wave applications", MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM DIGEST (MTT), 2011 IEEE MTT-S INTERNATIONAL, IEEE, (20110605), doi:10.1109/MWSYM.2011.5972664, ISBN 978-1-61284-754-2, pages 1 - 4, XP032006612 [I] 1-9 *Abstract* *I. Introduction* *II.Circuit Topology*;; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MWSYM.2011.5972664
 [A]  - XIAOLEI GAI ET AL, "A fully integrated low phase noise, fast locking, 31 to 34.9 GHz dual-loop PLL", MICROWAVE INTEGRATED CIRCUITS CONFERENCE (EUMIC), 2011 EUROPEAN, IEEE, (20111010), ISBN 978-1-61284-236-3, pages 648 - 651, XP032073131 [A] 1-9 *Abstract* *I. Introduction* *II.Circuit Topology*;; figure 1 *