Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2914625

EP2914625 - ANTI-VEGF/DLL4 DUAL VARIABLE DOMAIN IMMUNOGLOBULINS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.01.2020
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.01.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.12.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.10.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip23.01.2020New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AbbVie Inc.
1 North Waukegan Road
North Chicago, IL 60064 / US
[2015/37]
Inventor(s)01 / HICKSON, Jonathan, A.
725 Northwind Lane
Lake Villa, IL 60046 / US
02 / HAASCH, Deanna, L.
1414 Belle Haven Drive
Grayslake, IL 60030 / US
03 / GUPTA, Supriya
927 Robin Way
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
04 / CHARI, Ravi
2 Clara Street Apt.2
Worcester, MA 01606 / US
05 / ZAMIRI, Camellia
48152 Leigh Street
Fermont, CA 94539 / US
06 / GU, Jijie
19 Crimson Drive
Shrewsbury, MA 01545 / US
07 / AMBROSI, Dominic, J.
28 Oriental Street
Worcester, MA 01605 / US
08 / LAPPE, Susan, E.
601 Eagle Court
Riverwoods, IL 60015 / US
09 / LI, Yingchun
103 Newfield Drive
Buffalo Grove, IL 60089 / US
10 / NAUMOVSKI, Louie
570 Jay Street
Los Altos, CA 94022 / US
11 / CAO, Xianhua
4 North Empress Drive
Hawthorn Wood, IL 60047 / US
 [2015/37]
Representative(s)Plasseraud IP
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/37]Finnegan Europe LLP
16 Old Bailey
London EC4M 7EG / GB
Application number, filing date13789683.331.10.2013
[2015/37]
WO2013US67873
Priority number, dateUS201261721072P01.11.2012         Original published format: US 201261721072 P
US201361787927P15.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361787927 P
[2015/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2014071074
Date:08.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/19]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2914625
Date:09.09.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2014
[2015/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/337, A61K31/4745, A61K31/495, A61K31/525, A61K39/395, A61K45/06, C07K16/28, A61K39/00, A61K31/513, A61K31/7068, C07K16/22, C07K16/46
[2018/31]
Former International [2015/37]C07K16/18, C07K16/22, C07K16/46, A61K39/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/37]
Extension statesBA26.05.2015
ME26.05.2015
TitleGerman:IMMUNGLOBULINE MIT ZWEIFACHER VARIABLER ANTI-VEGF/DLL4-DOMÄNE UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON[2015/37]
English:ANTI-VEGF/DLL4 DUAL VARIABLE DOMAIN IMMUNOGLOBULINS AND USES THEREOF[2015/37]
French:IMMUNOGLOBULINES À DOMAINE VARIABLE DOUBLE ANTI-VEGF/DLL4 ET LEURS UTILISATIONS[2015/37]
Entry into regional phase26.05.2015National basic fee paid 
26.05.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
26.05.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/37]
31.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
08.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
13.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.05.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
16.08.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.12.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
24.01.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.05.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
07.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
10.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
08.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
11.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2012061374  (ABBOTT LAB [US], et al) [X] 1-62,66-85,87-99,101-107,109,112-127,129-132,134,137-148,150-152,154-156,158,161-166 * pages 4-31; claim all; sequences 243, 242 * [I] 63-65,110,128,135,149,153,159;
 [A]US2011217237  (CHEN MING-JIU [US], et al) [A] 1-85,87-99,101-107,109,110,112-132,134,135,137-156,158,159,161-166 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2011039370  (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [A] 1-85,87-99,101-107,109,110,112-132,134,135,137-156,158,159,161-166 * the whole document *
by applicantWO0177342
 US7612181
 US2011217237
 US2010076178
 US2009239259
 US7262028
 US7429486
 US6914128
 WO0202773
 US2009311253
 US5648260
 US5624821
 US4554101
 US2011189176
 US5089424
 US5006309
 US5294404
 US5063081
 US7419821
 US7682833
 US2004018577
 US2006160164
    - MILLER ET AL., J. LMMUNOL., (2003), vol. 170, no. 9, pages 4854 - 61
    - YAN ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2007), vol. 13, no. 24, pages 7243 - 7246
    - SHUTTER ET AL., GENES DEV., (2000), vol. 14, no. 11, pages 1313 - 1318
    - GALE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2004), vol. 101, no. 45, pages 15949 - 15954
    - KREBS ET AL., GENES DEV., (2000), vol. 14, no. 11, pages 1343 - 1352
    - DUARTE ET AL., GENES DEV., (2004), vol. 18, no. 20, pages 2474 - 2478
    - KREBS ET AL., GENES DEV., (2004), vol. 18, no. 20, pages 2469 - 2473
    - LIU ET AL., MOL. CELL BIOL., (2003), vol. 23, no. 1, pages 14 - 25
    - LOBOV ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2007), vol. 104, no. 9, pages 3219 - 3224
    - HARRINGTON ET AL., MICROVASC. RES., (2008), vol. 75, no. 2, pages 144 - 154
    - SUCHTING ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2007), vol. 104, no. 9, pages 3225 - 3230
    - MAILHOS ET AL., DIFFERENTIATION, (2001), vol. 69, no. 2-3, pages 135 - 144
    - PATEL ET AL., CANCER RES., (2005), vol. 65, no. 19, pages 8690 - 8697
    - PATEL ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2006), vol. 12, no. 16, pages 4836 - 4844
    - NOGUERA-TROISE ET AL., NATURE, (2006), vol. 444, no. 7122, pages 1032 - 1037
    - RIDGWAY ET AL., NATURE, (2006), vol. 444, no. 7122, pages 1083 - 1087
    - SCEHNET ET AL., BLOOD, (2007), vol. 109, no. 11, pages 4753 - 4760
    - DUROCHER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2002), vol. 30, no. 2
    - MIZUSHIMA; NAGATA, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1990), vol. 18, no. 17
    - MILSTEIN; CUELLO, NATURE, (1983), vol. 305, no. 5934, pages 537 - 40
    - STAERZ ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 314, no. 6012, pages 628 - 31
    - HOLLIGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, no. 14, pages 6444 - 6448
    - MARKS ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783
    - BARBAS ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 3809 - 3813
    - SCHIER ET AL., GENE, (1995), vol. 169, pages 147 - 155
    - YELTON ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 155, pages 1994 - 2004
    - JACKSON ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 154, no. 7, pages 3310 - 9
    - HAWKINS ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 226, pages 889 - 896
    - "CRYSTALLIZATION OF NUCLEIC ACIDS AND PROTEINS", GIEGE, R.; DUCRUIX, A. BARRETT, A PRACTICAL APPROACH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, (1999), pages 20 1 - 16
    - HOLLIGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448
    - POLJAK ET AL., STRUCTURE, (1994), vol. 2, pages 1121 - 1123
    - KABAT ET AL., ANN. NY ACAD. SCI., (1971), vol. 190, pages 382 - 391
    - CHOTHIA; LESK, J. MOL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917
    - CHOTHIA ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 342, pages 877 - 883
    - PADLAN, FASEB J., (1995), vol. 9, pages 133 - 139
    - MACCALLUM, J. MOL. BIOL., (1996), vol. 262, no. 5, pages 732 - 45
    - JONSSON ET AL., ANN. BIOL. CLIN., (1993), vol. 51, pages 19 - 26
    - KYTE ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1982), vol. 157, pages 105 - 132
    - BURKE ET AL., ADVANCED DRUG DELIV. REV., (2006), vol. 58, no. 3, pages 437 - 446
    - HILDEBRAND ET AL., SURFACE AND COATINGS TECHNOL., (2006), vol. 200, no. 22-23, pages 6318 - 6324
    - WU, BIOMATERIALS, (2006), vol. 27, no. 11, pages 2450 - 2467
    - MARQUES, "Biodegradable Systems in Tissue Engineer", REGEN. MED., (2005), pages 377 - 397
    - VON MEHREN ET AL., ANNU. REV. MED., (2003), vol. 54, pages 343 - 69
    - J. EXP. MED., (2012), vol. 209, no. 5, pages 1011 - 28
    - NEPHROL. DIAL. TRANSPLANT., (2003), vol. 18, no. 8, pages 1427 - 1430
    - PNAS, (2012), vol. 109, no. 27, pages E1868 - 77
    - CIRCULATION, (1998), vol. 98, no. 20, pages 2108 - 16
    - "CRYSTALLIZATION OF NUCLEIC ACIDS AND PROTEINS", GIEGE, R.; DUCRUIX, A. BARRETT, Practical Approach, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, (1999), pages 20 1 - 16
    - GOODSON, MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (1984), vol. 2, pages 115 - 138
    - HAMMERLING ET AL., MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES AND T-CELL HYBRIDOMAS, ELSEVIER, (1981), pages 563 - 681
    - KONTERMANN AND DUBEL, ANTIBODY ENGINEERING, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (2001), page 790
    - "CLONING AND EXPRESSION VECTORS FOR GENE FUNCTION ANALYSIS", LU; WEINER, MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, BIOTECHNIQUES PRESS, (1974), page 298
    - OLD, R.W.; S.B. PRIMROSE, PRINCIPLES OF GENE MANIPULATION: AN INTRODUCTION TO GENETIC ENGINEERING, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS, (1985), vol. 2, page 409
    - MOLECULAR CLONING: A LABORATORY MANUAL 2d Ed., COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1989), vol. 1-3
    - WINNACKER, E.L., FROM GENES TO CLONES: INTRODUCTION TO GENE TECHNOLOGY, VCH PUBLISHERS, (1987), page 634
 US20080021282