Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2912357

EP2912357 - SINGLE-USE VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.06.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019  [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Conseil et Technique
37 Coteaux de la Tuilerie
31650 Lauzerville / FR
For all designated states
Centre National d'Etudes Spatiales (CNES)
18 Avenue Edouard Belin
31000 Toulouse / FR
[2015/36]
Inventor(s)01 / VALEMBOIS, Guy
37 Coteaux de la Tuilerie
F-31650 Lauzerville / FR
02 / DILHAN, Denis
6 Chemin Fajolle
F-31190 Auterive / FR
03 / SALVETAT, Bernard
5 Rue Ernest Jeanbernat
F-31000 Toulouse / FR
 [2015/36]
Representative(s)Rhein, Alain
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon
4A, rue de l'Industrie
67450 Mundolsheim / FR
[2017/31]
Former [2015/36]Rhein, Alain
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon
4a, Rue de l'Industrie
67450 Mundolsheim / FR
Application number, filing date13789852.416.10.2013
[2015/36]
WO2013FR52467
Priority number, dateFR2012006007623.10.2012         Original published format: FR 1260076
[2015/36]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014064369
Date:01.05.2014
Language:FR
[2014/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2912357
Date:02.09.2015
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.2014
[2015/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2912357
Date:02.08.2017
Language:FR
[2017/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.05.2014
ClassificationInternational:F16K31/56, F16K17/40
[2015/36]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/36]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VENTIL ZUM EINMALIGEN GEBRAUCH[2015/36]
English:SINGLE-USE VALVE[2015/36]
French:VANNE A USAGE UNIQUE[2015/36]
Entry into regional phase07.05.2015National basic fee paid 
07.05.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
07.05.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/36]
28.01.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
15.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.06.2017Fee for grant paid
23.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.05.2017
Opposition(s)03.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/28]
Request for further processing for:15.03.2016Request for further processing filed
15.03.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
24.03.2016Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
17.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.10.2013
AT02.08.2017
CY02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
IT02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
MC02.08.2017
MK02.08.2017
MT02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SI02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
IE16.10.2017
LU16.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
[2019/51]
Former [2019/47]HU16.10.2013
AT02.08.2017
CY02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
IT02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
MC02.08.2017
MT02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SI02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
IE16.10.2017
LU16.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2019/31]HU16.10.2013
AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
IT02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
MC02.08.2017
MT02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SI02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
IE16.10.2017
LU16.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/45]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
IT02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
MC02.08.2017
MT02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SI02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
IE16.10.2017
LU16.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/43]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
IT02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
MC02.08.2017
MT02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SI02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
LU16.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/39]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
IT02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
MC02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SI02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
LU16.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/36]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
IT02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
MC02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
LU16.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/26]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
IT02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
MC02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/25]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
IT02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/21]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/12]AT02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/11]AT02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/10]AT02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
NO02.11.2017
Former [2018/09]FI02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
NO02.11.2017
Former [2018/08]FI02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
NO02.11.2017
Former [2018/07]LT02.08.2017
NO02.11.2017
Cited inInternational search[XD]US6302171  (WATTS BRUCE D [US]) [XD] 1,2,9 * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 25; figures 7,8 *;
 [XD]US6260570  (WASS LLOYD G [US], et al) [XD] 1,2,9 * column 4, line 40 - column 5, line 8 * * column 8, line 57 - column 9, line 23; figures 1A,11,12 *;
 [IDA]GB2424692  (YU HUANG SHENG [TW]) [ID] 1,2,9 * page 6, line 4 - page 12, line 12; figures 1-7 * [A] 3-6
by applicantUS6302171
 US6260570
 GB2424692