blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2849887

EP2849887 - PROCESS OF DRY MILLING PARTICULATE MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.02.2024
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.10.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.03.2024Change - divisional application(s)published on 01.05.2024  [2024/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Do, Inhwan
5876 Westminster
East Lansing, MI 48823 / US
For all designated states
Knox, Michael, R.
5337 Panda Bear Circle
East Lansing, MI 48823 / US
For all designated states
Murray, Scott, L.
1550 Stanlake Drive
East Lansing, MI 48823 / US
For all designated states
Privette, Robert, M.
1206 Burcham Drive
East Lansing, MI 48823 / US
[2023/45]
Former [2015/13]For all designated states
Do, In-Hwan
5876 Westminister
East Lansing, MI 48823 / US
For all designated states
Knox, Michael, R.
5337 Panda Bear Circle
East Lansing, MI 48823 / US
For all designated states
Murray, Scott, L.
1550 Stanlake Drive
East Lansing, MI 48823 / US
For all designated states
Privette, Robert, M.
1206 Burcham Drive
East Lansing, MI 48823 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2015/13]
Representative(s)Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[2024/12]
Former [2015/13]Busher, Samantha Jane
Elkington and Fife LLP
3-4 Holborn Circus
London, EC1N 2HA / GB
Application number, filing date13790097.301.05.2013
[2024/12]
WO2013US38967
Priority number, dateUS20121347486018.05.2012         Original published format: US201213474860
[2015/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2013173053
Date:21.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2849887
Date:25.03.2015
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2015/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2849887
Date:20.03.2024
Language:EN
[2024/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR21.11.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.12.2015
ClassificationIPC:B02C17/20, B82Y30/00, C04B35/626, C09D1/00, B82Y40/00, H01G11/36, H01G11/86, H01B1/04, H01M4/13, H01M4/36, H01G11/46
[2023/45]
CPC:
C04B35/6261 (EP,US); H01B1/04 (EP,KR,US); B02C17/20 (CN,US);
B32B5/16 (KR); C09D1/00 (EP,US); H01G11/46 (EP,US);
H01G11/86 (EP,US); H01M4/04 (US); H01M4/364 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/38 (US); H01M4/386 (US); H01M4/48 (US);
H01M4/587 (US); H01M4/622 (US); B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US); H01G11/36 (EP,US); H01M4/13 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP); Y02E60/13 (EP,US); Y10T428/2982 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2016/01]B02C17/20, C04B35/626, B82Y30/00, C01B31/04
Former IPC [2015/13]B02C17/20
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/13]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM TROCKENmahlung TEILCHENFÖRMIGER MATERIALIEN[2023/45]
English:PROCESS OF DRY MILLING PARTICULATE MATERIALS[2015/13]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE BROYAGE À SEC DE MATÉRIAUX PARTICULAIRES[2015/13]
Former [2015/13]VERFAHREN ZUM TROCKENFRÄSEN TEILCHENFÖRMIGER MATERIALIEN
Entry into regional phase18.11.2014National basic fee paid 
18.11.2014Search fee paid 
18.11.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
18.11.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/13]
29.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.10.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.03.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.03.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2023Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.10.2023
10.10.2023Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
13.10.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.02.2024Fee for grant paid
08.02.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.02.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP24164635.5
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.10.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
30.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
22.05.2020Renewal fee patent year 08
18.05.2021Renewal fee patent year 09
25.05.2022Renewal fee patent year 10
26.05.2023Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201705   M06   Fee paid on   12.07.2017
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US2009117467  (ZHAMU ARUNA [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-15 * paragraph [0144]; example 3 ** claims 1-10 *;
 [XAI]WO2009127901  (HIGH POWER LITHIUM S A [CH], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,9-15 * page 8, lines 1-20 * * examples 1,3 * * claims 1-3,8,27,28,32-38 * [A] 8 [I] 5
International search[Y]US2002134964  (CHRISTIAN PAUL A [US], et al);
 [Y]US2004137327  (GROSS KARL J [US], et al);
 [A]US2007077490  (KIM HAN-SU [KR], et al);
 [Y]US2008145293  (CARBERRY JOHN [US], et al);
 [X]US2010081057  (LIU JUN [US], et al);
 [A]WO2010036648  (UNIV PITTSBURGH [US], et al)
ExaminationEP2275385
 CN102214817
    - Zhongxue Chen ET AL, "In Situ Generation of Few-Layer Graphene Coatings on SnO2-SiC Core-Shell Nanoparticles for High-Performance Lithium-Ion Storage", ADVANCED ENERGY MATERIALS, DE, (20111116), vol. 2, no. 1, doi:10.1002/aenm.201100464, ISSN 1614-6832, pages 95 - 102, XP055369206

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/aenm.201100464
    - Weifeng Zhao ET AL, "Preparation of graphene by exfoliation of graphite using wet ball milling", Journal of Materials Chemistry, (20100101), vol. 20, no. 28, doi:10.1039/c0jm01354d, ISSN 0959-9428, page 5817, XP055133676

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c0jm01354d
by applicantUS2009117467
 WO2009127901
 EP2275385
 US2011111303
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.