EP2850434 - TUMOR CELL ISOLATION/PURIFICATION PROCESS AND METHODS FOR USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diatech Oncology LLC 9208 Heritage Dr. Brentwood, Tennessee 37027 / US | [2015/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRESANT, Cary 2345 Cumberland Road San Marino, CA 91108 / US | 02 /
PERREE, Mathieu 1620 Holy Cross Street Montreal H4E 2A1 / CA | 03 /
HALLQUIST, Allan 13351 Rosehawk Drive Morning View, KY 41063 / US | [2015/13] | Representative(s) | Hally, Anna-Louise FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/13] | Hally, Anna-Louise FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 13790721.8 | 14.03.2013 | WO2013US31300 | Priority number, date | US201261647248P | 15.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261647248 P | [2015/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013172955 | Date: | 21.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2850434 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.11.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/50, G01N33/557 | [2016/02] | CPC: |
G01N33/5011 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12N5/0693 (CN,KR,US);
C12Q1/24 (KR);
G01N33/15 (KR);
G01N33/52 (KR);
G01N33/557 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G01N33/574 (KR);
C12N2527/00 (US);
G01N2500/04 (US);
G01N2500/10 (CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/13] | G01N33/574, G01N33/15, C12N5/07 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/13] | Title | German: | TUMORZELLENISOLIERUNGS-/-REINIGUNGSVERFAHREN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2015/13] | English: | TUMOR CELL ISOLATION/PURIFICATION PROCESS AND METHODS FOR USE THEREOF | [2015/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ISOLEMENT/PURIFICATION DE CELLULES TUMORALES ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2015/13] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/13] | 16.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/03] | 26.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0240702 (UNIV VANDERBILT [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]US2011244503 (PERREE MATHIEU [CA], et al) [Y] 3-6,8,9,11 * whole document, in particular example 2; claim 10 *; | [XY] - KAREN S. BALLARD ET AL, "Endometrial carcinoma in vitro chemosensitivity testing of single and combination chemotherapy regimens using the novel microculture kinetic apoptosis assay: implications for endometrial cancer treatment", JOURNAL OF GYNECOLOGIC ONCOLOGY, (20100101), vol. 21, no. 1, doi:10.3802/jgo.2010.21.1.45, ISSN 2005-0380, page 45, XP055173007 [X] 1,2,7,10,12-15 * whole document, in particular p. 46, col. 1, par. 1p. 48, col. 1, par. 1; p. 49, col. 1, par. 1; table 2-5 * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3802/jgo.2010.21.1.45 | [Y] - KRAVTSOV ET AL, "Use of the microculture kinetic assay of apoptosis to determine chemosensitivities of leukemias", BLOOD, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, (19980801), vol. 92, no. 3, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 968 - 980, XP002118802 [Y] 1-15 * whole document, in particular p. 971, col. 1, par. 1 - col. 2, par. par. 2 * | [A] - KRAVTSOV ET AL, "A novel microculture kinetic assay (MiCK assay) for malignant cell growth and chemosensitivity", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CANCER, PERGAMON, GB, vol. 30, no. 10, doi:10.1016/0959-8049(94)00291-C, ISSN 0959-8049, (19940101), pages 1564 - 1570, (19940101), XP026212498 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0959-8049(94)00291-C | International search | [A]US6258553 (KRAVTSOV VLADIMIR D [US]); | [A]KR100721927B (ISU ABXIS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2011244503 (PERREE MATHIEU [CA], et al); | [X] - BALLARD ET AL., "Endometrial carcinoma in vitro chemosensitivity testing of single and combination chemotherapy regimens using the novel microculture kinetic apoptosis assay: implications for endometrial cancer treatment", JOURNAL OF GYNECOLOGIC ONCOLOGY, (201003), vol. 21, no. 1, pages 45 - 49, XP055173007 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3802/jgo.2010.21.1.45 |