Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2851363

EP2851363 - AGOMELATINE ACID RADICAL COMPOSITE, AND PREPARATION METHOD AND APPLICATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.11.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.12.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shanghai Righthand Pharmtech. Co., Ltd.
Room 134 Building 9 337 Zhou Zhu High Road
Zhoupu Zhen
Pudong, Shanghai 201318 / CN
[2015/13]
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Haiping
Room 134, Building 9, 337 Zhou Zhu High Road
Zhoupu Zhen
Pudong
Shanghai 201318 / CN
02 / CHI, Cheng
Room 134, Building 9, 337 Zhou Zhu High Road
Zhoupu Zhen
Pudong
Shanghai 201318 / CN
03 / CHI, Zhengming
Room 134, Building 9, 337 Zhou Zhu High Road
Zhoupu Zhen
Pudong
Shanghai 201318 / CN
04 / WANG, Jin
Room 134, Building 9, 337 Zhou Zhu High Road
Zhoupu Zhen
Pudong
Shanghai 201318 / CN
05 / XU, Guanyu
Room 134, Building 9, 337 Zhou Zhu High Road
Zhoupu Zhen
Pudong
Shanghai 201318 / CN
 [2018/01]
Former [2015/13]01 / WANG, Haiping
Room 134 Building 9 337 Zhou Zhu High Road
Zhoupu Zhen
Pudong
Shanghai 201318 / CN
02 / CHI, Cheng
Room 134 Building 9 337 Zhou Zhu High Road
Zhoupu Zhen
Pudong
Shanghai 201318 / CN
03 / CHI, Zhengming
Room 134 Building 9 337 Zhou Zhu High Road
Zhoupu Zhen
Pudong
Shanghai 201318 / CN
04 / WANG, Jin
Room 134 Building 9 337 Zhou Zhu High Road
Zhoupu Zhen
Pudong
Shanghai 201318 / CN
05 / XU, Guanyu
Room 134 Building 9 337 Zhou Zhu High Road
Zhoupu Zhen
Pudong
Shanghai 201318 / CN
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2018/01]
Former [2015/13]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13790987.514.05.2013
[2018/01]
WO2013CN75574
Priority number, dateCN20121014790414.05.2012         Original published format: CN201210147904
CN20121017863503.06.2012         Original published format: CN201210178635
CN20121018448107.06.2012         Original published format: CN201210184481
[2015/13]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013170738
Date:21.11.2013
Language:ZH
[2013/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2851363
Date:25.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2851363
Date:03.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN21.11.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:C07C309/30, C07C309/29, C07C303/32, A61K31/185, A61K31/165, A61P9/00, A61P25/22, A61P25/18, A61P25/24
[2015/13]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/13]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:RADIKALISCHE AGOMELATINSÄUREZUSAMMENSETZUNG, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND ANWENDUNG DAVON[2015/13]
English:AGOMELATINE ACID RADICAL COMPOSITE, AND PREPARATION METHOD AND APPLICATION THEREOF[2015/13]
French:COMPOSITE À BASE DE RADICAL ACIDE D'AGOMÉLATINE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET APPLICATION ASSOCIÉS[2015/13]
Entry into regional phase12.12.2014Translation filed 
12.12.2014National basic fee paid 
12.12.2014Search fee paid 
12.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/13]
09.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.02.2017Observations by third parties
25.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.11.2017Fee for grant paid
23.11.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.11.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.07.2017
Opposition(s)05.10.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
16.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
CZ03.01.2018
DK03.01.2018
EE03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
IT03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
MC03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RO03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
SI03.01.2018
SK03.01.2018
SM03.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
IE14.05.2018
LU14.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
[2019/24]
Former [2019/19]AL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
CZ03.01.2018
DK03.01.2018
EE03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
IT03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
MC03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RO03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
SI03.01.2018
SK03.01.2018
SM03.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
IE14.05.2018
LU14.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/17]AL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
CZ03.01.2018
DK03.01.2018
EE03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
IT03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
MC03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RO03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
SI03.01.2018
SK03.01.2018
SM03.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
LU14.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/12]AL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
CZ03.01.2018
DK03.01.2018
EE03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
IT03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
MC03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RO03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
SI03.01.2018
SK03.01.2018
SM03.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/06]AL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
CZ03.01.2018
DK03.01.2018
EE03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
IT03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
MC03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RO03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
SK03.01.2018
SM03.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
CZ03.01.2018
DK03.01.2018
EE03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
IT03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RO03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
SK03.01.2018
SM03.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
CZ03.01.2018
DK03.01.2018
EE03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
IT03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RO03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
SK03.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
CZ03.01.2018
EE03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
IT03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RO03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
SK03.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/49]AL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
EE03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
IT03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RO03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
IT03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
Former [2018/36]CY03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
NO03.04.2018
Former [2018/35]CY03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
NO03.04.2018
Former [2018/34]FI03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
NO03.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2011313198  (ZHANG PENG [CN] ET AL) [Y] 1-17 * abstract * * examples 1-5, 8, 9 *;
 [XPI]CN102911075  ;
 [XPI]CN102718676  ;
 [XP]CN102702008  ;
 [XP]CN102718675  ;
 [E]WO2014096373  (LESVI LABORATORIOS SL [ES]) [E] 1-6,9-12,16,17 * pages 15,41-42 *
 [Y]  - YAN YAN ET AL, "Improving the Solubility of Agomelatine via Cocrystals", CRYSTAL GROWTH & DESIGN, (20120502), vol. 12, no. 5, doi:10.1021/cg201423q, ISSN 1528-7483, pages 2226 - 2233, XP055028201 [Y] 1-17 * page 2228, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 2232, column 1, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cg201423q
 [Y]  - SAI-LI ZHENG ET AL, "Structures of Polymorphic Agomelatine and Its Cocrystals with Acetic Acid and Ethylene Glycol", CRYSTAL GROWTH & DESIGN, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, vol. 11, doi:10.1021/CG101234P, ISSN 1528-7483, (20110202), pages 466 - 471, (20110106), XP002658583 [Y] 1-17 * page 466, column 2, paragraph l * * page 470, column 2, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cg101234p
 [XPI]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2013, no. 49, Database accession no. 2013-H27051, XP002752427 & CN102911075 A 20130206 (FUJIAN GUANGSHENGTANG PHARM CO LTD) [XP] 1,4-6,8-11,16,17 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph [0004] * * page 6; table 1 * * page 9, paragraph [0069] * [I] 1-17
 [XPI]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2013, no. 35, Database accession no. 2012-R41528, XP002752428 & CN102718676 A 20121010 (FUJIAN GUANGSHENGTANG PHARM CO LTD) [XP] 1,4-6,8-11 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph [0002] * [I] 1-17
 [XP]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2013, no. 19, Database accession no. 2013-A79662, XP002752429 & CN102702008 A 20121003 (SHANGHAI RIGHT HAND PHARM TECHN DEV CO) [XP] 1-14,16,17 * abstract * * examples 1-5; claims 6-8,10-13,16,17 *
 [XP]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2013, no. 74, Database accession no. 2013-U42632, XP002752430 & CN102718675 A 20121010 (CHI C) [XP] 1,2,4-11,13-17 * abstract * * examples 1-5; claims 2,3,7-10,12,14,15,17 *
International search[XP]CN102702041  (SHANGHAI RIGHT HAND PHARM TECHN DEV CO);
 [XP]CN102718675  (SHANGHAI RIGHT HAND PHARM TECHN DEV CO);
 [XP]CN102702008  (SHANGHAI RIGHT HAND PHARM TECHN DEV CO);
 [XP]WO2012146371  (ZENTIVA, K.S.);
 [X]CN101481321  (SHANGHAI INST PHARM IND)
by applicantEP0447285
 EP1564202
 CN20051071611
 CN20091047399
otherEP0447285