Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2851363 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2851363



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 758
07.11.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
26.01.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
07.12.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
23.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.11.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
23.11.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
23.11.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
25.07.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
25.07.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
25.07.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
25.07.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 42
25.07.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 42
24.05.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
17.02.2017 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
17.02.2017 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 45
10.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.02.2017 Observations by third parties Search / examination 6
10.02.2017 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 38
23.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
23.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
23.11.2016 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 50
23.11.2016 Priority search results Search / examination 9
23.11.2016 Priority search results Search / examination 4
23.11.2016 Priority search results Search / examination 4
23.11.2016 Priority search results Search / examination 4
23.11.2016 Priority search results Search / examination 22
23.11.2016 Priority search results Search / examination 3
23.11.2016 Priority search results Search / examination 4
23.11.2016 Priority search results Search / examination 4
23.11.2016 Priority search results Search / examination 23
23.11.2016 Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results Search / examination 1
22.09.2016 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
09.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
09.09.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
09.09.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
09.09.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 25
09.09.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 27
09.09.2016 Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 13
09.09.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
09.09.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
09.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
09.09.2016 Translation of priority document Search / examination 23
09.09.2016 Translation of priority document Search / examination 18
09.09.2016 Translation of priority document Search / examination 20
03.03.2016 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
03.03.2016 Invitation to file a translation of the previous application Search / examination 1
15.02.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
15.02.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 10
15.02.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
15.02.2016 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 3
18.12.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
08.10.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.09.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
25.02.2015 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
12.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.02.2015 Drawings Search / examination 15
12.02.2015 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
22.01.2015 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
16.01.2015 Deficiencies in application documents - annex 2 Search / examination 2
14.01.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.01.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.01.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.01.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.01.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.12.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
12.12.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
12.12.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
12.12.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
12.12.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 26
12.12.2014 Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 15
12.12.2014 Claims Search / examination 7
12.12.2014 Description Search / examination 29
12.12.2014 Drawings Search / examination 15
12.12.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
02.12.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
02.12.2014 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 12
26.09.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
21.01.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 17
21.01.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 16
21.01.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 16
21.11.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
21.11.2013 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 4
21.11.2013 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 38