Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2851363


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
10.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.06.2019  [2019/24]
05.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.05.2019  [2019/19]
22.03.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
22.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.03.2019  [2019/13]
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
04.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.02.2019  [2019/06]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
16.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.12.2018  [2018/51]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
09.11.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
02.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.12.2018  [2018/49]
19.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
14.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.10.2018  [2018/42]
07.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.10.2018  [2018/41]
31.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.10.2018  [2018/40]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
10.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.09.2018  [2018/37]
03.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.09.2018  [2018/36]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
01.12.2017 (Expected) grant published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
28.11.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
28.11.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
25.11.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
24.07.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
21.07.2017 Change - inventor
19.05.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.02.2017 New entry: Observations by third parties
09.09.2016 Amendment by applicant
04.05.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.02.2016 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  16.03.2016  [2016/11]
05.02.2016 Change - classification published on  09.03.2016  [2016/10]
05.02.2016 Change - classification published on  09.03.2016  [2016/10]
06.10.2015 Change - representative
17.07.2015 Change - extension states published on  19.08.2015  [2015/34]
20.05.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.02.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  25.03.2015  [2015/13]
20.02.2015 Request for examination filed published on  25.03.2015  [2015/13]
29.01.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
15.01.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
10.01.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
16.12.2014 Amendment by applicant
13.12.2014 Change - representative
13.12.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
06.12.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
22.11.2013 PCT data prior to European publication