Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2782452

EP2782452 - DIVIDING ASSEMBLY FOR MOVING PORTIONS OF DOUGH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.10.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
König Maschinen Gesellschaft mbH
Statteggerstrasse 80
8045 Graz / AT
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / SAUSENG, Robert
Grazer Strasse 46
A-8061 St. Radegund / AT
02 / PÖLLABAUER, Johann
Kaiserwaldweg 32
A-Wundschuh 8142 / AT
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Wildhack & Jellinek
Patentanwälte Landstraßer Hauptstraße 50
1030 Wien / AT
[2014/40]
Application number, filing date13791724.109.09.2013
[2015/49]
WO2013AT50179
Priority number, dateAT2012005038813.09.2012         Original published format: AT 503882012
[2014/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014040106
Date:20.03.2014
Language:DE
[2014/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2782452
Date:01.10.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2014
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2782452
Date:02.12.2015
Language:DE
[2015/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:A21C5/04
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUSWIEGEANORDNUNG ZUM VERSCHIEBEN VON TEIGPORTIONEN[2014/40]
English:DIVIDING ASSEMBLY FOR MOVING PORTIONS OF DOUGH[2014/40]
French:ENSEMBLE DE PESÉE DE PRÉCISION POUR DÉPORTER DES PORTIONS DE PÂTE[2014/40]
Entry into regional phase24.06.2014National basic fee paid 
24.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
25.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.10.2015Fee for grant paid
07.10.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.10.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.06.2015
Opposition(s)05.09.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU09.09.2013
AL02.12.2015
BG02.12.2015
CY02.12.2015
CZ02.12.2015
EE02.12.2015
FI02.12.2015
HR02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
MC02.12.2015
MK02.12.2015
MT02.12.2015
NL02.12.2015
RO02.12.2015
RS02.12.2015
SI02.12.2015
SK02.12.2015
SM02.12.2015
GR03.03.2016
IS02.04.2016
PT04.04.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/38]HU09.09.2013
BG02.12.2015
CY02.12.2015
CZ02.12.2015
EE02.12.2015
FI02.12.2015
HR02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
MC02.12.2015
MK02.12.2015
MT02.12.2015
NL02.12.2015
RO02.12.2015
RS02.12.2015
SI02.12.2015
SK02.12.2015
SM02.12.2015
GR03.03.2016
IS02.04.2016
PT04.04.2016
Former [2018/32]HU09.09.2013
CY02.12.2015
CZ02.12.2015
EE02.12.2015
FI02.12.2015
HR02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
MC02.12.2015
MK02.12.2015
MT02.12.2015
NL02.12.2015
RO02.12.2015
RS02.12.2015
SI02.12.2015
SK02.12.2015
SM02.12.2015
GR03.03.2016
IS02.04.2016
PT04.04.2016
Former [2018/30]HU09.09.2013
CY02.12.2015
CZ02.12.2015
EE02.12.2015
FI02.12.2015
HR02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
MC02.12.2015
MK02.12.2015
NL02.12.2015
RO02.12.2015
RS02.12.2015
SI02.12.2015
SK02.12.2015
SM02.12.2015
GR03.03.2016
IS02.04.2016
PT04.04.2016
Former [2017/31]CZ02.12.2015
EE02.12.2015
FI02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
MC02.12.2015
NL02.12.2015
RO02.12.2015
RS02.12.2015
SI02.12.2015
SK02.12.2015
SM02.12.2015
GR03.03.2016
IS02.04.2016
PT04.04.2016
Former [2016/49]CZ02.12.2015
EE02.12.2015
FI02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
NL02.12.2015
RO02.12.2015
RS02.12.2015
SI02.12.2015
SK02.12.2015
SM02.12.2015
GR03.03.2016
IS02.04.2016
PT04.04.2016
Former [2016/38]CZ02.12.2015
EE02.12.2015
FI02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
NL02.12.2015
RO02.12.2015
RS02.12.2015
SK02.12.2015
SM02.12.2015
GR03.03.2016
IS02.04.2016
PT04.04.2016
Former [2016/36]CZ02.12.2015
EE02.12.2015
FI02.12.2015
IS02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
NL02.12.2015
RO02.12.2015
RS02.12.2015
SK02.12.2015
GR03.03.2016
Former [2016/34]CZ02.12.2015
FI02.12.2015
IS02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
NL02.12.2015
RS02.12.2015
GR03.03.2016
Former [2016/31]FI02.12.2015
IS02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
NL02.12.2015
RS02.12.2015
GR03.03.2016
Former [2016/26]FI02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
NL02.12.2015
RS02.12.2015
GR03.03.2016
Former [2016/25]FI02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
RS02.12.2015
GR03.03.2016
Former [2016/24]FI02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
RS02.12.2015
GR03.03.2016
Former [2016/23]LT02.12.2015
RS02.12.2015
Former [2016/20]LT02.12.2015
Cited inInternational search[A]DE3011863  (KEMPER KATE [CH]) [A] 1-21 * page 4, line 1 - line 7; figures 1,5 * * page 9, line 4 - line 12 *;
 [A]AT348457B  (KOENIG HELMUT [ST] KOENIG HELMUT [AT]; KOENIG HELMUT [ST]) [A] 1-21 * page 2, line 1 - line 10; figure 1 * * page 3, line 28 - line 44 *;
 [A]US1871261  (EGGERT GUSTAV B) [A] 1-21 * page 1, line 1 - line 18; figures 1-3 * * page 2, line 32 - page 3, line 83 *;
 [A]EP2174549  (ITECA S P A [IT]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0008] , [0010] - [0013]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0040] *