Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2931167

EP2931167 - ONE-PART OR MULTI-PART IMPLANT SYSTEM COMPRISING A MOUNTING ELEMENT HAVING ONE OR MORE OUTER RINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.02.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.11.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SM
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Jehle, Thomas
Graf 150
6500 Grins / AT
For all designated states
Siegele, Otmar
See Labebene 230
6555 Kappl / AT
[2019/29]
Former [2017/39]For all designated states
Kulzer GmbH
Leipziger Strasse 2
63450 Hanau / DE
Former [2015/43]For all designated states
Heraeus Kulzer GmbH
Grüner Weg 11
63450 Hanau / DE
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2019/29]
Former [2015/43]01 / JEHLE, Thomas
Bruggfeldstr. 31
A-6500 Landeck / AT
02 / SIEGELE, Otmar
See Labebene 230
A-6555 Kappl / AT
Representative(s)Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/10]Bendele, Tanja
RUHR-IP Patentanwälte
Brucker Holt 58
45133 Essen / DE
Former [2015/43]Bendele, Tanja
Postfach 23 01 44
D-45069 Essen / DE
Application number, filing date13791738.107.11.2013
[2015/43]
WO2013EP03349
Priority number, dateDE2012102423011.12.2012         Original published format: DE102012024230
DE2013100251713.02.2013         Original published format: DE102013002517
[2015/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014090358
Date:19.06.2014
Language:DE
[2014/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2931167
Date:21.10.2015
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2014
[2015/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2931167
Date:06.03.2019
Language:DE
[2019/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61C8/00, A61C13/265
[2015/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:EIN- ODER MEHRTEILIGES IMPLANTATSYSTEM MIT EINEM AUFBAUELEMENT MIT EINEM ODER MEHREREN AUSSENRINGEN[2015/43]
English:ONE-PART OR MULTI-PART IMPLANT SYSTEM COMPRISING A MOUNTING ELEMENT HAVING ONE OR MORE OUTER RINGS[2015/43]
French:SYSTÈME D'IMPLANT EN UNE OU PLUSIEURS PARTIES, MUNI D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE MONTAGE PRÉSENTANT UNE OU PLUSIEURS BAGUES EXTÉRIEURES[2015/43]
Entry into regional phase06.07.2015National basic fee paid 
06.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
06.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/43]
18.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.01.2019Fee for grant paid
17.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.09.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
24.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
22.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL06.03.2019
EE06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SM06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
[2019/52]
Former [2019/49]AL06.03.2019
EE06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
NO06.06.2019
Cited inInternational search[XAI]EP0445667  (THULL ROGER [DE]) [X] 1,9,11,12,14,17,19,25 * paragraphs [0002] , [0 18] , [0 24] - [0029] - [0 38]; figures 1, 4 * [A] 2-4,15,21-24,26,27 [I] 5-8,10,13,16,18,20;
 [XAI]WO2011027230  (FISCHLER TITUS [CH]) [X] 1,21-23,26,27 * page 14, line 10 - line 15; figures 1,3 * [A] 2-20,25 [I] 24;
 [XA]US6299447  (ZUEST PAUL T [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,15,19,21 * column 16, line 19 - line 43; figures 29, 30 * [A] 3,5-14,16-18,20,22-27;
 [XA]WO2006138351  (ZIMMER DENTAL INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,15,17,19,21,23,25 * page 4, line 30 - page 22, line 4; figures 1-29, 41-60 * [A] 5-14,16,18,20,22,24,26,27
ExaminationUS5417569