Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2946120

EP2946120 - COUPLING HAVING AN IMPROVED STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.05.2018
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.05.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.06.2018  [2018/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RDO Alpha
41 rue Pasteur
08320 Vireux Molhain / FR
[2015/48]
Inventor(s)01 / RODRIGUES DE OLIVEIRA, Carlos
1 rue de Mon Plaisir
F-08600 Givet / FR
 [2015/48]
Representative(s)Hege, Frédéric
Hege Conseils
1 Place Gutenberg
67000 Strasbourg / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/48]Rhein, Alain
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon
L'Escurial - Technolpole Nancy Brabois
17, Avenue de la Forêt de Haye
54500 Vandoeuvre les Nancy / FR
Application number, filing date13791848.818.10.2013
[2015/48]
WO2013FR52492
Priority number, dateFR2013005037316.01.2013         Original published format: FR 1350373
[2015/48]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014111634
Date:24.07.2014
Language:FR
[2014/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2946120
Date:25.11.2015
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2014
[2015/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:F16B4/00, F16B15/02
[2015/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/48]
TitleGerman:KOPPLUNG MIT VERBESSERTER STRUKTUR[2015/48]
English:COUPLING HAVING AN IMPROVED STRUCTURE[2015/48]
French:ASSEMBLAGE DE STRUCTURE AMÉLIORÉ[2015/48]
Entry into regional phase22.07.2015National basic fee paid 
22.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
22.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/48]
03.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.01.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/25]
08.02.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/25]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.08.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
19.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
23.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[I]US4097168  (PAGEL PAUL V) [I] 1-10 * column 5, lines 1-10 * * column 7, line 36 - line 59; figures 17,18 *;
 [A]US2490594  (MADDEN CHARLES L) [A] 7,10 * column 2, lines 15-25 * * column 3, lines 1-20 * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 14; figures 4-6 *;
 [I]US3418012  (LA TORRE JACK) [I] 1,2,5,6,8,9 * column 5, lines 5-12 * * column 6, line 21 - column 7, line 29 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]FR1492368  (TINNERMAN PRODUCTS INC) [A] 3,4,7 * figures 1-6 *;
 [I]US2024069  (SHARP JOHN H) [I] 1 * page 2; figures 1-3 *