Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2936297

EP2936297 - DISPLAY CONTROL DEVICE, DISPLAY CONTROL METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.08.2016
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[2015/44]
Inventor(s)01 / NAGAHIRO, Koji
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
 [2015/44]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[2015/44]
Application number, filing date13791861.124.10.2013
[2015/44]
WO2013JP06318
Priority number, dateJP2012027553918.12.2012         Original published format: JP 2012275539
[2015/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014097523
Date:26.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2936297
Date:28.10.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014
[2015/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/14
[2015/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/44]
TitleGerman:ANZEIGESTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, ANZEIGESTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM[2015/44]
English:DISPLAY CONTROL DEVICE, DISPLAY CONTROL METHOD, AND PROGRAM[2015/44]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'AFFICHAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'AFFICHAGE, ET PROGRAMME[2015/44]
Entry into regional phase07.07.2015National basic fee paid 
07.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
07.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/44]
14.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.2017Date of oral proceedings
18.07.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
18.07.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination08.09.2017Appeal received No.  T2604/17
20.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.06.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
24.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
25.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2006085753  (VANCE SCOTT L [US] ET AL) [X] 1-13,16-20 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0033]; figures 1-10 * [Y] 14,15;
 [Y]US2012306737  (SWEET MICHAEL R [US]) [Y] 14,15 * paragraph [0032]; figure 1 *