blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2858791 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2858791



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 239
25.07.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
20.09.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
24.08.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
09.08.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
09.08.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
09.08.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
20.04.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
20.04.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
20.04.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
20.04.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
20.04.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 24
07.03.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
10.01.2017 Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant Search / examination 1
12.12.2016 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
29.11.2016 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 18
29.11.2016 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
29.11.2016 Request for correction of errors in filed documents Search / examination 1
24.11.2016 Indication of deficiencies in a request for entry of a change in personal particulars and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
17.11.2016 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 1
18.03.2015 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
23.01.2015 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
21.01.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.01.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.01.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.01.2015 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 6
07.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
07.01.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
07.01.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
07.01.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
07.01.2015 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
05.01.2015 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
24.10.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
15.05.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
15.05.2014 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
01.04.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
01.04.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
01.04.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
14.01.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 38
19.12.2013 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 27
18.11.2013 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
18.11.2013 Claims International Searching Authority 4
18.11.2013 Description International Searching Authority 12
18.11.2013 Drawings International Searching Authority 9