blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2858791


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.05.2019  [2019/19]
22.03.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
08.03.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
27.07.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
01.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.07.2018  [2018/27]
25.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.2018  [2018/26]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
11.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
20.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
09.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.04.2018  [2018/15]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
16.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.03.2018  [2018/12]
09.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
26.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
19.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.02.2018  [2018/08]
12.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.02.2018  [2018/07]
18.08.2017 (Expected) grant published on  20.09.2017  [2017/38]
11.08.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
11.08.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
11.08.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
30.06.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.04.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
14.04.2017 Change - inventor
17.03.2017 Change - German title published on  19.04.2017  [2017/16]
06.01.2017 Change - applicant published on  08.02.2017  [2017/06]
24.06.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.08.2015 Change - extension states published on  16.09.2015  [2015/38]
02.07.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.03.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  15.04.2015  [2015/16]
13.03.2015 Request for examination filed published on  15.04.2015  [2015/16]
29.01.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
17.01.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
09.01.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
09.01.2015 Amendment by applicant
08.01.2015 Change - representative
08.01.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
16.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
09.01.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
20.12.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
10.12.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
26.11.2013 PCT data prior to European publication