Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2858791

EP2858791 - AN EXOSKELETON STRUCTURE FOR PHYSICAL INTERACTION WITH A HUMAN BEING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.08.2017
Database last updated on 22.08.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.08.2017(Expected) grantpublished on 20.09.2017 [2017/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Scuola Superiore di Studi Universitari e di Perfezionamento Sant'Anna
Piazza Martiri della Libertà, 33
56127 Pisa / IT
[2017/06]
Former [2015/16]For all designated states
Scuola Superiore S.Anna
Piazza Martiri della Libertà 33
56127 Pisa / IT
Inventor(s)01 / BERGAMASCO, Massimo
V. Don Minzoni 144
56010 Castelmaggiore - Calci / IT
02 / SALSEDO, Fabio
Via La Tinta 4
56125 Pisa / IT
03 / LENZO, Basilio
Via Anita Garibaldi 30
57025 Piombino (LI) / IT
[2017/38]
Former [2015/16]01 / BERGAMASCO, Massimo
V. Don Minzoni 144
I-56010 Castelmaggiore - Calci / IT
02 / SALSEDO, Fabio
Via La Tinta 4
I-56125 Pisa / IT
03 / LENZO, Basilio
Via Anita Garibaldi 30
I-57025 Piombino (LI) / IT
Representative(s)Celestino, Marco
ABM Agenzia Brevetti & Marchi, Viale Giovanni Pisano, 31
56123 Pisa / IT
[2015/16]
Application number, filing date13792438.711.06.2013
[2017/38]
WO2013IB54783
Priority number, dateIT2012PI0006911.06.2012         Original published format: IT PI20120069
[2015/16]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013186705
Date:19.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2858791
Date:15.04.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2013
[2015/16]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP2858791
Date:20.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/38]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
EP15.05.2014
ClassificationInternational:B25J9/00
[2015/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:EIN EXOSKELETT STRUKTUR FÜR DIE KÖRPERLICH INTERAKTION MIT EINEM MANN[2017/16]
English:AN EXOSKELETON STRUCTURE FOR PHYSICAL INTERACTION WITH A HUMAN BEING[2015/16]
French:STRUCTURE D'EXOSQUELETTE PERMETTANT UNE INTERACTION PHYSIQUE AVEC UN ÊTRE HUMAIN[2015/16]
Former [2015/16]EXOSKELETTSTRUKTUR ZUR PHYSISCHEN INTERAKTION MIT EINER PERSON
Entry into regional phase07.01.2015National basic fee paid 
07.01.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/16]
20.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.08.2017Fee for grant paid
09.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.04.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2008031023  (UNIV OHIO [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * page 6, line 20 - page 11, line 7 * [I] 5-8;
 [A]WO2008131563  (UNIV KINGSTON [CA], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2012042416  (SCUOLA SUPERIORE S ANNA [IT], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - BERGAMASCO M ET AL, "An arm exoskeleton system for teleoperation and virtual environments applications", ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION, 1994. PROCEEDINGS., 1994 IEEE INTERNATIONAL C ONFERENCE ON SAN DIEGO, CA, USA 8-13 MAY 1994, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, (19940508), doi:10.1109/ROBOT.1994.351286, ISBN 978-0-8186-5330-8, pages 1449 - 1454, XP010097703 [A] 1-8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ROBOT.1994.351286
by applicantWO2004058458
 US2011098619
 WO2008031023