Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2800811 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2800811



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 33992
06.09.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
06.09.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
06.09.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
06.09.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
06.09.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
06.09.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
06.09.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
06.09.2018 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
30.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
30.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
30.08.2018 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 3
30.05.2018 Request concerning the applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
06.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
06.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
06.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
06.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
06.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
06.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
06.04.2018 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
05.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
05.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
05.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
05.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
05.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
05.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
05.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
04.04.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
04.04.2018 Invitation to file an authorisation Opposition 1
27.03.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
27.03.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
27.03.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
27.03.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
27.03.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
27.03.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
27.03.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
23.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
23.03.2018 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 3
22.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
22.03.2018 Change of representative of the proprietor Opposition 2
22.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
21.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
21.03.2018 Change of representative of the proprietor Opposition 1
21.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
19.03.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 44
19.03.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 15
19.03.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 26
19.03.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.03.2018 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
16.03.2018 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 2
02.03.2018 Request concerning representative opponent Opposition 1
01.03.2018 Request concerning representative opponent Opposition 2
01.03.2018 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
20.02.2018 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
20.02.2018 Request concerning representative opponent Opposition 1
16.02.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.02.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.02.2018 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 10
16.02.2018 Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied Opposition 2
16.02.2018 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
16.02.2018 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
16.02.2018 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
13.02.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
12.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 3
12.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
12.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 37
12.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 44
12.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 108
12.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 24
12.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 76
12.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 91
12.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 15
12.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 20
12.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 14
12.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 16
12.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 15
12.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 17
12.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
12.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 13
12.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
12.02.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 33
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 68
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 68
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 41
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 44
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 44
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 51
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
12.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
12.02.2018 Notice of opposition Opposition 43
12.02.2018 Notice of opposition Opposition 12
12.02.2018 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
12.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 179
12.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 361
12.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
12.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
12.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 361
12.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 275
12.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 80
12.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 361
12.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
12.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
12.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 179
12.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
12.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 352
12.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 179
12.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 275
12.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 352
12.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 80
12.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
12.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 275
12.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 143
12.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 143
12.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 156
11.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 3
11.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 108
11.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 18
11.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 14
11.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 9
11.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 25
11.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 44
11.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 13
11.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 36
11.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 37
11.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 6
11.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 32
11.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
11.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
11.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
11.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
11.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
11.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
11.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
11.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
11.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
11.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
11.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 41
11.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 35
11.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
11.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
11.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.02.2018 Notice of opposition Opposition 41
11.02.2018 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
11.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
11.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 80
11.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 143
09.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 4
09.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
09.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
09.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
09.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
09.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
09.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
09.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
09.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
09.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
09.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 5
09.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 80
09.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 26
09.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 44
09.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 15
09.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 16
09.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 8
09.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 11
09.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 17
09.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 3
09.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 7
09.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
09.02.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 33
09.02.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
09.02.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 84
09.02.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
09.02.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
09.02.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
09.02.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
09.02.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 34
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 34
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 42
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 65
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 37
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 68
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 43
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 41
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 41
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 455
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 44
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 35
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 44
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 41
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 36
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
09.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
09.02.2018 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
09.02.2018 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
09.02.2018 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
09.02.2018 Notice of opposition Opposition 23
09.02.2018 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
09.02.2018 Notice of opposition Opposition 61
09.02.2018 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
09.02.2018 Notice of opposition Opposition 69
09.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 143
09.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 68
09.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 158
09.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 174
09.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 300
09.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
09.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 80
09.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 257
09.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 170
09.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 306
09.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
09.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 67
09.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 62
09.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 159
09.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 322
09.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 126
09.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 300
09.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 306
09.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 361
09.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 143
09.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 306
09.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 164
09.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
09.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 442
09.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 143
09.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 80
09.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 275
09.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 343
09.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 80
09.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 322
09.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
09.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 65
09.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
09.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 179
08.02.2018 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 5
08.02.2018 Letter concerning fees and payments Opposition 1
08.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
08.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 36
08.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
08.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
08.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
08.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
08.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
08.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
08.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 37
08.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
08.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
08.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
08.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
08.02.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
08.02.2018 Notice of opposition Opposition 23
08.02.2018 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
19.05.2017 Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied within the opposition period Opposition 2
19.05.2017 Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied within the opposition period Opposition 2
19.05.2017 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
16.05.2017 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
12.05.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 3
12.05.2017 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
12.05.2017 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
11.05.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
10.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
10.05.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 3
10.05.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
13.04.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
12.04.2017 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
03.04.2017 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
03.04.2017 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
29.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.03.2017 Withdrawal of designation of a Contracting State Search / examination 1
29.03.2017 Withdrawal of designation of a Contracting State Search / examination 1
27.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.03.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
27.03.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 7
27.03.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
27.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
24.03.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
24.03.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
24.03.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 3
24.03.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 330
24.03.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 330
24.03.2017 Text intended for grant (sequence listing) Search / examination 3790
20.01.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
06.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.01.2017 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 2
22.12.2016 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 4
19.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.12.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
16.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.12.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 6
15.12.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 3
12.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.12.2016 Description Search / examination 46
12.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.12.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.12.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
08.12.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
22.09.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
22.09.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
22.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.09.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
22.09.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
22.09.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 37
12.05.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
12.05.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.04.2016 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 138
20.04.2016 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 33
20.04.2016 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 8
20.04.2016 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 4
20.04.2016 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 21
20.04.2016 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 25
20.04.2016 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 15
20.04.2016 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 22
20.04.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 9
08.04.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
14.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
14.03.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
14.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
14.03.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 14
14.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
14.03.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 11
14.03.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
14.03.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
14.03.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 11
14.03.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
18.09.2015 Acknowledgement of receipt of observations by third party Search / examination 1
18.09.2015 Communication to applicant regarding observations by third parties Search / examination 137
11.09.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
04.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
04.09.2015 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 4
04.09.2015 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 18
04.09.2015 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 5
04.09.2015 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 68
04.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.09.2015 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 4
04.09.2015 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 8
04.09.2015 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 4
04.09.2015 Observations by third parties Search / examination 25
26.08.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
26.08.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 7
26.08.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 4
04.08.2015 Acknowledgement of receipt of observations by third party Search / examination 1
04.08.2015 Communication to applicant regarding observations by third parties Search / examination 1075
27.07.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
24.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
24.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
24.07.2015 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 3
24.07.2015 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 41
24.07.2015 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 3
24.07.2015 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 6
24.07.2015 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 22
24.07.2015 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 3
24.07.2015 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 4
24.07.2015 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 18
24.07.2015 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 8
24.07.2015 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 26
24.07.2015 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 45
24.07.2015 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 12
24.07.2015 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 9
24.07.2015 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 27
24.07.2015 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 4
24.07.2015 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 25
24.07.2015 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 2
24.07.2015 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 4
24.07.2015 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 35
24.07.2015 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 18
24.07.2015 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 8
24.07.2015 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 27
24.07.2015 Observations by third parties Search / examination 108
24.07.2015 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 306
24.07.2015 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 80
24.07.2015 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 143
24.07.2015 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 87
12.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
12.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
12.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
12.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
12.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
12.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
12.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
12.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
12.06.2015 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 13
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 6
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 9
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 11
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 46
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 23
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 12
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 12
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 12
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 11
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 6
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 7
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 9
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 6
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 5
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 11
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 5
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 21
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 16
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 5
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 6
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 7
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 6
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 30
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 3
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 9
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 6
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 11
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 3
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 81
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 8
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 8
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 16
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 44
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 10
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 6
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 8
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 11
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 4
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 10
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 8
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 5
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 12
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 8
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 6
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 6
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 17
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 87
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 6
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 7
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 8
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 5
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 9
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 9
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 8
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 12
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 11
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 6
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 7
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 11
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 14
12.06.2015 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 5
11.05.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
08.05.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
20.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.03.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
20.03.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
20.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
06.03.2015 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
12.02.2015 Communication to applicant regarding observations by third parties Search / examination 14
12.02.2015 Communication to applicant regarding observations by third parties Search / examination 21
05.02.2015 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 18
05.02.2015 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
03.02.2015 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 9
03.02.2015 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 1
03.02.2015 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
03.02.2015 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
12.01.2015 Acknowledgement of receipt of observations by third party Search / examination 1
12.01.2015 Communication to applicant regarding observations by third parties Search / examination 1
08.01.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.01.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.01.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.01.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.01.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.01.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
06.01.2015 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 12
06.01.2015 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 3
06.01.2015 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 12
06.01.2015 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 2
06.01.2015 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 9
06.01.2015 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 1
06.01.2015 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 2
06.01.2015 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 4
06.01.2015 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 18
06.01.2015 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 3
06.01.2015 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 8
06.01.2015 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 3
06.01.2015 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 7
06.01.2015 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 6
06.01.2015 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 12
06.01.2015 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 8
06.01.2015 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 6
06.01.2015 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 9
06.01.2015 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 4
06.01.2015 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 28
06.01.2015 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 2
06.01.2015 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 4
06.01.2015 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 37
06.01.2015 Observations by third parties Search / examination 18
06.01.2015 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
06.01.2015 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
06.01.2015 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
06.01.2015 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
06.01.2015 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
06.01.2015 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
06.01.2015 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
06.01.2015 Observations by third parties Search / examination 18
11.12.2014 Communication to applicant regarding observations by third parties Search / examination 475
08.12.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 12
05.12.2014 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 5
05.12.2014 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 6
05.12.2014 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 52
05.12.2014 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 126
05.12.2014 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 4
05.12.2014 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 117
05.12.2014 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 8
05.12.2014 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 80
05.12.2014 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 68
05.12.2014 Observations by third parties Search / examination 8
22.10.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
22.10.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
15.10.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
14.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
14.10.2014 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
10.09.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
04.09.2014 Notice on debiting of fees Search / examination 1
22.08.2014 Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant Search / examination 1
15.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.08.2014 Annex Search / examination 1
15.08.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.08.2014 Request for correction of client data Search / examination 1
07.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
07.08.2014 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 3790
07.08.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
07.08.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
07.08.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
23.07.2014 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
02.07.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 361
02.07.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 179
02.01.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
19.12.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 143
19.12.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 275
28.11.2013 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 3790
28.11.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 5
28.11.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 347