Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2800811


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
19.05.2017 Opposition filed published on  21.06.2017  [2017/25]
12.05.2017 Opposition filed published on  14.06.2017  [2017/24]
07.04.2017 (Expected) grant published on  10.05.2017  [2017/19]
31.03.2017 Change - divisional application(s) published on  03.05.2017  [2017/18]
31.03.2017 Change - applicant published on  03.05.2017  [2017/18]
31.03.2017 Change - designated states published on  03.05.2017  [2017/18]
29.03.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
29.03.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
29.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.03.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
23.03.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
17.03.2017 Deletion: Communication of intention to grant a patent
17.01.2017 Change - representative
19.12.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
19.12.2016 New entry: Observations by third parties
16.12.2016 Change - inventor
12.12.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
23.09.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
23.05.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
13.05.2016 First examination report published on  15.06.2016  [2016/24]
22.04.2016 New entry: Observations by third parties
06.04.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.03.2016 Amendment by applicant
16.09.2015 New entry: Observations by third parties
21.08.2015 Change - classification published on  23.09.2015  [2015/39]
21.08.2015 Change - classification published on  23.09.2015  [2015/39]
21.08.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  23.09.2015  [2015/39]
27.07.2015 New entry: Observations by third parties
01.04.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.03.2015 Amendment by applicant
10.02.2015 New entry: Observations by third parties
08.01.2015 New entry: Observations by third parties
09.12.2014 New entry: Observations by third parties
17.10.2014 New entry: Fee payment for extension state
17.10.2014 Change - extension states published on  19.11.2014  [2014/47]
10.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.11.2014  [2014/46]
10.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  12.11.2014  [2014/46]
29.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
19.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
13.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
08.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
11.12.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
29.11.2013 PCT data prior to European publication