blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2800811 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201380038920 CN201710585690 EP13793997 EP17163434 EP18152360



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019169649Global Dossier 06.06.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201916277090 15.02.2019
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019169648Global Dossier 06.06.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
US201916276374 14.02.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019169647Global Dossier 06.06.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201916276368 14.02.2019
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019169646Global Dossier 06.06.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201916276365 14.02.2019
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019169645Global Dossier 06.06.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201916276361 14.02.2019
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019169644Global Dossier 06.06.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201916276356 14.02.2019
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019169643Global Dossier 06.06.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
US201916276352 14.02.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019169642Global Dossier 06.06.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201916276348 14.02.2019
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019169641Global Dossier 06.06.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201916276343 14.02.2019
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019106715Global Dossier 11.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201816201865 27.11.2018
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019106714Global Dossier 11.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201816201862 27.11.2018
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019106713Global Dossier 11.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201816201855 27.11.2018
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019106712Global Dossier 11.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201816201853 27.11.2018
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019093129Global Dossier 28.03.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
US201816201836 27.11.2018
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019062790Global Dossier 28.02.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201815915020 07.03.2018
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019010520Global Dossier 10.01.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201816136175 19.09.2018
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201514685504 13.04.2015
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019002923Global Dossier 03.01.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201514685504 13.04.2015
US201816136168 19.09.2018
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019002922Global Dossier 03.01.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201514942782 16.11.2015
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201514685502 13.04.2015
US201615138604 26.04.2016
US201514685513 13.04.2015
US201514685514 13.04.2015
US201514685504 13.04.2015
US201514685516 13.04.2015
US201816136165 19.09.2018
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019002921Global Dossier 03.01.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201514942782 16.11.2015
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201514685502 13.04.2015
US201615138604 26.04.2016
US201514685513 13.04.2015
US201514685514 13.04.2015
US201514685504 13.04.2015
US201514685516 13.04.2015
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201361757640 28.01.2013
US201816136159 19.09.2018
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018312875Global Dossier 01.11.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201816033005 11.07.2018
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018312874Global Dossier 01.11.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201816033002 11.07.2018
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018298407Global Dossier 18.10.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201815959735 23.04.2018
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018298406Global Dossier 18.10.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201815959715 23.04.2018
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018282764Global Dossier 04.10.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201615090511 04.04.2016
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201715803424 03.11.2017
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
US201414403475 24.11.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018273981Global Dossier 27.09.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201815959802 23.04.2018
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018251795Global Dossier 06.09.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201514942782 16.11.2015
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201514685502 13.04.2015
US201615138604 26.04.2016
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201815981809 16.05.2018
US201514685514 13.04.2015
US201514685504 13.04.2015
US201514685516 13.04.2015
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018251794Global Dossier 06.09.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201514942782 16.11.2015
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201815981808 16.05.2018
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201514685502 13.04.2015
US201615138604 26.04.2016
US201514685513 13.04.2015
US201514685514 13.04.2015
US201514685504 13.04.2015
US201514685516 13.04.2015
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018251793Global Dossier 06.09.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201815981807 16.05.2018
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201514685504 13.04.2015
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018251791Global Dossier 06.09.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201815965603 27.04.2018
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018245101Global Dossier 30.08.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
US201815965598 27.04.2018
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018245100Global Dossier 30.08.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201815959782 23.04.2018
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018237801Global Dossier 23.08.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201815959762 23.04.2018
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018230497Global Dossier 16.08.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201514942782 16.11.2015
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201514685502 13.04.2015
US201615138604 26.04.2016
US201514685513 13.04.2015
US201514685514 13.04.2015
US201514685504 13.04.2015
US201514685516 13.04.2015
US201815947718 06.04.2018
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018230496Global Dossier 16.08.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201514942782 16.11.2015
US201815947700 06.04.2018
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201514685502 13.04.2015
US201615138604 26.04.2016
US201514685513 13.04.2015
US201514685514 13.04.2015
US201514685504 13.04.2015
US201514685516 13.04.2015
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018230495Global Dossier 16.08.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201514685504 13.04.2015
US201815947680 06.04.2018
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018208931Global Dossier 26.07.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201815925544 19.03.2018
US201514942782 16.11.2015
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201715435233 16.02.2017
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201514685502 13.04.2015
US201615138604 26.04.2016
US201514685513 13.04.2015
US201514685514 13.04.2015
US201514685504 13.04.2015
US201514685516 13.04.2015
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2017166893Global Dossier 15.06.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201514942782 16.11.2015
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201715435233 16.02.2017
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201514685502 13.04.2015
US201615138604 26.04.2016
US201514685513 13.04.2015
US201514685514 13.04.2015
US201514685504 13.04.2015
US201514685516 13.04.2015
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2017051312Global Dossier 23.02.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201615090511 04.04.2016
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
US201414403475 24.11.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2016068864Global Dossier 10.03.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201514685516 13.04.2015
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2016060654Global Dossier 03.03.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201514685514 13.04.2015
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2016060653Global Dossier 03.03.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201514685513 13.04.2015
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2016046961Global Dossier 18.02.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201314403475 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10337029Global Dossier 02.07.2019B2
US2019106711 11.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
US201816201848 27.11.2018
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10308961Global Dossier 04.06.2019B2
US2018312876 01.11.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201816033016 11.07.2018
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10301651Global Dossier 28.05.2019B2
US2016130609 12.05.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201514685504 13.04.2015
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10266850Global Dossier 23.04.2019B2
US2014068797 06.03.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10227611Global Dossier 12.03.2019B2
US2016138008 19.05.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201514942782 16.11.2015
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10113167Global Dossier 30.10.2018B2
US2017051310 23.02.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201514942782 16.11.2015
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201514685502 13.04.2015
US201615138604 26.04.2016
US201514685513 13.04.2015
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201514685514 13.04.2015
US201514685504 13.04.2015
US201514685516 13.04.2015
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10000772Global Dossier 19.06.2018B2
US2016130608 12.05.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201514685502 13.04.2015
US201313842859 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20170134766Global Dossier 06.12.2017A
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20150016588Global Dossier 12.02.2015A
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6343605BGlobal Dossier 13.06.2018B2
JP2015523856 20.08.2015A
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3401400Global Dossier 03.04.2019B1
EP3401400 14.11.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
EP17163434 15.03.2013
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
EP13793997 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3241902Global Dossier 28.02.2018B1
EP3241902 08.11.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201361757640 28.01.2013
EP13793997 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN107603976Global Dossier 19.01.2018A
Priority number Date
CN201380038920 15.03.2013
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104854241BGlobal Dossier 14.07.2017B
CN104854241 19.08.2015A
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2800811Global Dossier 10.05.2017B1
EP2800811 23.09.2015A4
EP2800811 12.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2013266968B 29.06.2017B2
AU2013266968 20.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2017225060B 17.01.2019B2
AU2017225060 28.09.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
AU2013266968 15.03.2013
AU2017225060 07.09.2017
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2019201850 11.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
AU2013266968 15.03.2013
AU2019201850 18.03.2019
AU2017225060 07.09.2017
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112014029441 27.06.2017A2
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2872241 28.11.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CO7151523 29.12.2014A2
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CR20140538 18.02.2015A
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CY1119282T 14.02.2018T1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK2800811T 17.07.2017T3
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK3241902T 07.05.2018T3
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201361757640 28.01.2013
EP13793997 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK3401400T 03.06.2019T3
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
EP17163434 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EA201401319 29.05.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2636902T 10.10.2017T3
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB2518764 24.08.2016C
GB2518764 02.03.2016B
GB2518764 22.07.2015A8
GB2518764 01.04.2015A
GB201420270D 31.12.2014D0
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB2537000 08.03.2017B
GB2537000 05.10.2016A
GB201601071D 02.03.2016D0
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
GB201420270 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1204003 06.11.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1207107 22.01.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1211978 03.06.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HRP20171163T 06.10.2017T1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
EP13793997 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HRP20180794T 13.07.2018T1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
EP17163434 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL235461 31.01.2019A
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL261563D 31.10.2018D0
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL261565D 31.10.2018D0
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL261566D 31.10.2018D0
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL261567D 31.10.2018D0
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL261568D 31.10.2018D0
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL261569D 31.10.2018D0
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL261570D 31.10.2018D0
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
LT2800811T 11.09.2017T
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MA37663 31.05.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ME02836 20.01.2018B
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
EP13793997 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX349744 10.08.2017B
MX2014014477 20.08.2015A
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ714353 26.05.2017A
Priority number Date
NZ70132613 15.03.2013
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ728024 31.05.2019A
Priority number Date
NZ71435313 15.03.2013
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ730667 31.05.2019A
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
NZ72802413 15.03.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PH12014502574 21.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL2800811T 30.11.2017T3
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201361757640 28.01.2013
EP13793997 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL3241902T 28.09.2018T3
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
EP17163434 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
EP13793997 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RS56119 31.10.2017B1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
EP13793997 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RS57287 31.08.2018B1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
EP17163434 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SG11201407702X 30.12.2014A
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SI2800811T 30.10.2017T1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
EP13793997 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SI3241902T 31.07.2018T1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
EP17163434 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TN2014000493 30.03.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
UA118014 12.11.2018C2
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
WO2013US32589 15.03.2013
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013176772Global Dossier 28.11.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2018138054Global Dossier 06.09.2018A
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CL2014003208 19.06.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE202013012240U 02.02.2016U1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE202013012241U 18.01.2016U1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE202013012242U 02.02.2016U1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2670718T 31.05.2018T3
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB201511669D 19.08.2015D0
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HUE038850T 28.11.2018T2
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
LT3241902T 25.06.2018T
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
LT3401400T 10.06.2019T
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PE03362015 25.03.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT2800811T 17.08.2017T
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT3241902T 28.05.2018T
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
SG10201701800Y 27.04.2017A
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
SG10201809817U 28.12.2018A
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TR201806812T 21.06.2018T4
Priority number Date
US201261652086 25.05.2012
US201361765576 15.02.2013
US201261716256 19.10.2012
US201361757640 28.01.2013
TypeType Divisional application
 EP3241902
 EP3401400