Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2816985

EP2816985 - PLUNGER SYSTEM FOR INTRAOCULAR LENS SURGERY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.01.2017  [2017/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
[2015/10]
Former [2015/01]For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
For all designated states
Brown, Kyle
5909 River Bend Drive
Fort Worth, Texas 76132 / US
For all designated states
Downer, David
5217 Spanish River Trail
Fort Worth, Texas 76137 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BROWN, Kyle
5909 River Bend Drive
Fort Worth, Texas 76132 / US
02 / DOWNER, David Anthony
5217 Spanish River Trail
Fort Worth, Texas 76137 / US
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Hanna, Peter William Derek , et al
Hanna Moore + Curley
Garryard House
25/26 Earlsfort Terrace
Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2015/01]Hanna, Peter William Derek , et al
Hanna Moore & Curley
13 Lower Lad Lane
Dublin 2 / IE
Application number, filing date13794376.721.05.2013
WO2013US41992
Priority number, dateUS20121347655621.05.2012         Original published format: US201213476556
[2015/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013177144
Date:28.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2816985
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2013
[2015/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.11.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61F9/007
[2015/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/01]
TitleGerman:KOLBENSYSTEM FÜR INTRAOKULARLINSENCHIRURGIE[2015/01]
English:PLUNGER SYSTEM FOR INTRAOCULAR LENS SURGERY[2015/01]
French:SYSTÈME DE PISTON POUR CHIRURGIE INTRAOCULAIRE[2015/01]
Entry into regional phase25.09.2014National basic fee paid 
25.09.2014Search fee paid 
25.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
25.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
24.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.07.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/01]
18.08.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2017/01]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.03.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2007098622  (SDI SURGICAL DEVICE INTERNAT G [CH]; MEYER ROLF [CH]) [X] 1-3,5,9-11 * page 1, lines 9-10 * * page 9, line 26 - page 11, line 30; figures 3-5 * [Y] 4,6-8,12;
 [XI]WO9637152  (CHAMBERS THOMAS J [US]) [X] 1-3,5,8,10-12 * page 1, lines 19-23 * * page 6, lines 14-19 * * page 15, line 5 - page 16, line 9; figures 1-3,7,10; claims 9,16 * [I] 9;
 [XAI]EP1800622  (SDI SURGICAL DEVICE INTERNAT G [CH]) [X] 1,2,8 * paragraphs [0001] , [05.9] , [0046]; figures 1-6; claims 1,3,15 * [A] 3-6 [I] 9-12;
 [Y]US2010125278  (WAGNER CHRISTOPHER E [US]) [Y] 7,8,12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0020]; figures 1-3 *;
 [Y]EP1290990  (CANON STAAR CO INC [JP] STAAR JAPAN INC [JP]) [Y] 4,6 * claim 9 *;
 [A]US2007050023  (BESSIERE BENOIT [FR] ET AL) [A] 1,10 * paragraph [0055] *
International search[X]US2009240257  (MEYER, R);
 [Y]US5876440  (FEINGOLD, V);
 [Y]US2006235430  (LE, AN ET AL.);
 [Y]US2010312254  (DOWNER, DA, ET AL.);
 [A]US7947049  (VAQUERO, E);
 [A]US2009171366  (TANAKA, M);
 [A]US2005154399  (WEBER, DA, ET AL.);
 [A]US2007050023  (BESSIERE, B, ET AL.);
 [A]US2007150056  (MEYER, R);
 [A]US2009054904  (HOLMEN, J)
by applicantWO2007098622
 WO9637152
 EP1800622