Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2919623

EP2919623 - LIGHTING UNIT FOR A DISPLAY SHELF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.11.2017
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Diam UK Ltd
Jubilee Drive
Loughborough
Leicestershire LE11 5XS / GB
[2015/39]
Inventor(s)01 / KERR, Eamonn
Diam UK Ltd
Jubilee Drive
Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 5XS / GB
02 / MANSELL, Peter
Diam UK Ltd
Jubilee Drive
Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 5XS / GB
03 / ALLEN, Martin
Diam UK Ltd
Jubilee Drive
Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 5XS / GB
 [2015/39]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/39]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
Alpha Tower
Suffolk Street Queensway
Birmingham B1 1TT / GB
Application number, filing date13794961.615.11.2013
[2015/39]
WO2013GB53027
Priority number, dateEP2012019303516.11.2012         Original published format: EP 12193035
EP2013015485411.02.2013         Original published format: EP 13154854
[2015/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014076495
Date:22.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2919623
Date:23.09.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2014
[2015/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.05.2014
ClassificationInternational:A47F3/00, A47F11/10
[2015/39]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/39]
TitleGerman:BELEUCHTUNGSEINHEIT FÜR EIN AUSLAGEREGAL[2015/39]
English:LIGHTING UNIT FOR A DISPLAY SHELF[2015/39]
French:UNITÉ D'ÉCLAIRAGE POUR UN PRÉSENTOIR[2015/39]
Entry into regional phase11.06.2015National basic fee paid 
11.06.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
11.06.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/39]
20.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.11.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
14.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XAI]US2005082450  (BARRETT JOHN [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,16 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0081] * * figures 20-22 * [A] 5-15 [I] 17,18;
 [X]US6361180  (IIMURA KEIJI [JP]) [X] 19 * column 6, line 5 - line 17 * * figures 1-5 *