Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2901349

EP2901349 - BUSINESS METHOD INCLUDING CHALLENGE-RESPONSE SYSTEM TO SECURELY AUTHENTICATE SOFTWARE APPLICATION PROGRAM INTERFACES (APIs) [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.08.2017
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.10.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ARRIS Enterprises LLC
3871 Lakefield Drive
Suwanee, GA 30024 / US
[2017/31]
Former [2016/13]For all designated states
Arris Enterprises, Inc.
3871 Lakefield Drive
Suwanee, Georgia 30024 / US
Former [2015/38]For all designated states
Arris Technology, Inc.
3871 Lakefield Drive
Suwanee GA 30024 / US
Former [2015/32]For all designated states
General Instrument Corporation
101 Tournament Drive
Horsham, Pennsylvania 19044 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SPRUNK, Eric, J.
7309 Bolero Street
Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US
02 / DEPIETRO, Mark, G.
655 Brampton Lane
Harleysville, PA 19438 / US
03 / MEDVINSKY, Alexander
8873 Hampe Court
San Diego, CA 92129 / US
04 / MORONEY, Paul
7357 Fay Avenue
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
05 / QIU, Xin
10529 Harvest View
San Diego, CA 92128 / US
 [2015/32]
Representative(s)Openshaw & Co.
8 Castle Street
Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB
[2015/32]
Application number, filing date13795326.129.10.2013
WO2013US67353
Priority number, dateUS201261719923P29.10.2012         Original published format: US 201261719923 P
US201261719928P29.10.2012         Original published format: US 201261719928 P
[2015/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014070800
Date:08.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2901349
Date:05.08.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2014
[2015/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.05.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/12
[2015/32]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/32]
TitleGerman:GESCHÄFTSVERFAHREN MIT EINEM HERAUSFORDERUNGSREAKTIONSSYSTEM ZUR SICHEREN AUTHENTIFIKATION VON SOFTWAREANWENDUNGS-PROGRAMMSCHNITTSTELLEN (APIS)[2015/32]
English:BUSINESS METHOD INCLUDING CHALLENGE-RESPONSE SYSTEM TO SECURELY AUTHENTICATE SOFTWARE APPLICATION PROGRAM INTERFACES (APIs)[2015/32]
French:PROCÉDÉ COMMERCIAL COMPRENANT UN SYSTÈME DÉFI-RÉPONSE POUR AUTHENTIFIER DE MANIÈRE SÛRE DES INTERFACES DE PROGRAMME D'APPLICATION (API) DE LOGICIEL[2015/32]
Entry into regional phase29.04.2015National basic fee paid 
29.04.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
29.04.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/32]
18.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.03.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
05.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.08.2017
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
05.06.2018Request for further processing filed
05.06.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.06.2018Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
29.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[I]US2011030040  (RONCHI CORRADO [IT], et al) [I] 1-20 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036]; figure 3; claim 2 *;
 [I]US2011197077  (CHAN TAT KEUNG [US], et al) [I] 1-20 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0037] *;
 [A]  - Anonymous, "Challenge-response authentication - Wikipedia, the free encyclopedia", (20120907), URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Challenge%E2%80%93response_authentication&oldid=511227391, (20140212), XP055101700 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *
by applicantUS4860353
 US6961427