Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2914506

EP2914506 - A CLOSURE FOR A CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.11.2016
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip03.01.2020New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2015/37]
Inventor(s)01 / PAGAN, Alfredo
One Procter&Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
02 / ANDRES, Brian, David
One Procter&Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
03 / VIOLA-PRIOLI, Cristian Alexis
One Procter&Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
04 / MCCONVILLE, Su-yon
One Procter&Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
05 / NGUYEN, Tuan
Nypro Mold
144 Pleasant St.
Clinton, MA 01510 / US
06 / STEPHENSON, John, Robert
Nypro Mold
144 Pleasant St.
Clinton, MA 01510 / US
 [2015/37]
Representative(s)Mathys & Squire
Mathys & Squire Europe LLP
Maximilianstraße 35
Eingang A
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/37]Hirsch, Uwe Thomas M.H.
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date13796179.330.10.2013
[2015/37]
WO2013US67490
Priority number, dateUS201261720172P30.10.2012         Original published format: US 201261720172 P
[2015/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014070879
Date:08.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2914506
Date:09.09.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2014
[2015/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.05.2014
ClassificationInternational:B65D47/12, B65D47/24
[2015/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/37]
TitleGerman:VERSCHLUSS FÜR EINEN BEHÄLTER[2015/37]
English:A CLOSURE FOR A CONTAINER[2015/37]
French:ÉLÉMENT DE FERMETURE POUR UN CONTENANT[2015/37]
Entry into regional phase25.03.2015National basic fee paid 
25.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
25.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/37]
11.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.09.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.12.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.05.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
07.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
11.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
15.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]GB2150124  (CODA PLASTICS LTD) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9412426  (JOHNSON & SON INC S C [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 3, line 21 - line 25 * * page 5, line 21 - line 35 * * page 7, line 4 - line 20; figures 1-6; claims 1-11 *;
 [X]EP0181115  (EVANS TREVOR GWILYM [GB], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 11, line 19 - page 13, line 22; figures 4,5; claims 1,2,3,4,5,6 *;
 [I]US2012181278  (PAGAN ALFREDO [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0054]; figures 1-8; claims 1-27 *;
 [A]EP1681243  (RIEKE CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0029]; figures 1-18; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]US4867354  (SCHREIBER ALEXANDER R [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 44; figures 1-12; claim 1 * * column 6, line 13 - column 8, line 10; figures 1-12; claim 1 *