Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2809917

EP2809917 - BUFFER SYSTEM THAT COMMUNICATES BUFFER SUPPLY AIR TO A PORTION OF A GAS TURBINE ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.10.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
United Technologies Corporation
10 Farm Springs Road
Farmington, CT 06032 / US
[2016/43]
Former [2014/50]For all designated states
United Technologies Corporation
One Financial Plaza
Hartford, CT 06101 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MUNSELL, Peter, M.
12 Candlewood Lane
Granby, CT 06035 / US
02 / STRIPINIS, Philip, S.
164 Farms Village Rd.
Rocky Hill, CT 06067 / US
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]Hull, James Edward
Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date13796350.016.01.2013
[2017/48]
WO2013US21654
Priority number, dateUS20121336233031.01.2012         Original published format: US201213362330
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013180761
Date:05.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2809917
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2013
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2809917
Date:29.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US05.12.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:F02C7/06, F02C6/08, F02C6/04, F02G3/00, F01D25/18, F01D25/12, F02C7/18
[2015/34]
Former International [2014/50]F02C7/06, F02C6/08, F02C6/04, F02G3/00, F01D25/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SPERRLUFTSYSTEM ZUR KOMMUNIKATION VON SPERRLUFT ZU EINEM TEIL EINES GASTURBINENTRIEBWERKS[2017/19]
English:BUFFER SYSTEM THAT COMMUNICATES BUFFER SUPPLY AIR TO A PORTION OF A GAS TURBINE ENGINE[2014/50]
French:SYSTÈME D'AIR DE BARRAGE COMMUNICANT DE L'AIR DE BARRAGE À UNE PARTIE D'UN MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ[2017/19]
Former [2014/50]PUFFERSYSTEM ZUR KOMMUNIKATION VON PUFFERZULUFT ZU EINEM TEIL EINES GASTURBINENTRIEBWERKS
Former [2014/50]SYSTÈME TAMPON COMMUNICANT DE L'AIR D'ALIMENTATION DE TAMPON À UNE PARTIE D'UN MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ
Entry into regional phase20.08.2014National basic fee paid 
20.08.2014Search fee paid 
20.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
20.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
16.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.10.2017Fee for grant paid
03.10.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.10.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP17203848.1  / EP3309372
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.05.2017
Opposition(s)30.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
24.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.11.2017
CY29.11.2017
CZ29.11.2017
DK29.11.2017
EE29.11.2017
ES29.11.2017
FI29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
IT29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
MC29.11.2017
NL29.11.2017
PL29.11.2017
RO29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SE29.11.2017
SI29.11.2017
SK29.11.2017
SM29.11.2017
IE16.01.2018
LU16.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
BG28.02.2018
NO28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
[2019/30]
Former [2019/09]AT29.11.2017
CY29.11.2017
CZ29.11.2017
DK29.11.2017
EE29.11.2017
ES29.11.2017
FI29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
IT29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
NL29.11.2017
PL29.11.2017
RO29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SE29.11.2017
SI29.11.2017
SK29.11.2017
SM29.11.2017
IE16.01.2018
LU16.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
BG28.02.2018
NO28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
Former [2018/52]AT29.11.2017
CY29.11.2017
CZ29.11.2017
DK29.11.2017
EE29.11.2017
ES29.11.2017
FI29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
IT29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
NL29.11.2017
PL29.11.2017
RO29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SE29.11.2017
SI29.11.2017
SK29.11.2017
SM29.11.2017
LU16.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
BG28.02.2018
NO28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
Former [2018/50]AT29.11.2017
CY29.11.2017
CZ29.11.2017
DK29.11.2017
EE29.11.2017
ES29.11.2017
FI29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
IT29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
NL29.11.2017
PL29.11.2017
RO29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SE29.11.2017
SK29.11.2017
SM29.11.2017
LU16.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
BG28.02.2018
NO28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
Former [2018/47]AT29.11.2017
CY29.11.2017
CZ29.11.2017
DK29.11.2017
EE29.11.2017
ES29.11.2017
FI29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
IT29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
NL29.11.2017
PL29.11.2017
RO29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SE29.11.2017
SK29.11.2017
SM29.11.2017
LU16.01.2018
BG28.02.2018
NO28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
Former [2018/40]AT29.11.2017
CY29.11.2017
CZ29.11.2017
DK29.11.2017
EE29.11.2017
ES29.11.2017
FI29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
IT29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
NL29.11.2017
PL29.11.2017
RO29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SE29.11.2017
SK29.11.2017
SM29.11.2017
BG28.02.2018
NO28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
Former [2018/39]AT29.11.2017
CY29.11.2017
CZ29.11.2017
DK29.11.2017
EE29.11.2017
ES29.11.2017
FI29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
IT29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
NL29.11.2017
PL29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SE29.11.2017
SK29.11.2017
SM29.11.2017
BG28.02.2018
NO28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
Former [2018/37]AT29.11.2017
CY29.11.2017
CZ29.11.2017
DK29.11.2017
EE29.11.2017
ES29.11.2017
FI29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
NL29.11.2017
PL29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SE29.11.2017
SK29.11.2017
SM29.11.2017
BG28.02.2018
NO28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
Former [2018/35]AT29.11.2017
CY29.11.2017
CZ29.11.2017
DK29.11.2017
EE29.11.2017
ES29.11.2017
FI29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
NL29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SE29.11.2017
SK29.11.2017
BG28.02.2018
NO28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
Former [2018/34]AT29.11.2017
DK29.11.2017
ES29.11.2017
FI29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
NL29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SE29.11.2017
BG28.02.2018
NO28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
Former [2018/24]AT29.11.2017
ES29.11.2017
FI29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SE29.11.2017
BG28.02.2018
NO28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
Former [2018/22]ES29.11.2017
FI29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
NO28.02.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2010092116  (FRANCONI ROBERT B [US]) [X] 1-8,11-15 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0021] * [I] 9,10;
 [X]US2009104020  (ROUSH ERIC DAVID [US] ET AL) [X] 1,3-5,13,14 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0016] *;
 [X]EP2119892  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-5,13,14 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021] *;
 [X]US2009196736  (SENGAR AJIT SINGH [IN] ET AL) [X] 1,4,13,14 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0019] *;
 [A]US2009277155  (BULIN GUILLAUME [FR] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0127] *
International search[X]US4497172  (SMITH);
 [Y]US2009104020  (ROUSH ET AL.);
 [Y]US4513567  (DEVEAU ET AL.);
 [Y]US3729957  (PETRIE ET AL.);
 [Y]US2010218483  (SMITH);
 [Y]US2009277155  (BULIN ET AL.)
by applicantUS2010092116