Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2856671

EP2856671 - FEEDBACK METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR COOPERATIVE TRANSMISSION OF MULTIPLE CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.11.2018
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[2015/15]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Hyo Jin
No. 409 Hans Ville Apt.
Yeoksam-dong
Gangnam-gu
Seoul 135-080 / KR
02 / KIM, Youn Sun
No.103-803 Parktown Daerim Apt.
Sunae-dong
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-020 / KR
03 / LEE, Ju-Ho
No. 728-1701 Salgugol 7-danji Hyundai Apt.
Yeongtong2-dong
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-472 / KR
 [2015/15]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/15]Jenkins, Richard Gavin
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date13797297.203.06.2013
WO2013KR04873
Priority number, dateUS201261654259P01.06.2012         Original published format: US 201261654259 P
[2015/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013180549
Date:05.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2856671
Date:08.04.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2013
[2015/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR05.12.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04B17/00, H04B7/04, H04B7/06, H04L5/00
[2016/03]
Former International [2015/15]H04B17/00, H04B7/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/15]
TitleGerman:RÜCKMELDUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG FÜR KOOPERATIVE ÜBERTRAGUNG MEHRERER ZELLEN[2015/15]
English:FEEDBACK METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR COOPERATIVE TRANSMISSION OF MULTIPLE CELLS[2015/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE RÉTROACTION POUR ÉMISSION COOPÉRATIVE DE MULTIPLES CELLULES[2015/15]
Entry into regional phase26.11.2014National basic fee paid 
26.11.2014Search fee paid 
26.11.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
26.11.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/15]
21.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.10.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.10.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.11.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
18.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
16.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
22.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
21.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]  - ERICSSON ET AL, "RI and PMI sharing between multiple CSI processes", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-122836, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120512), vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20120521 - 20120530, XP050601012 [X] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [XI]  - ZTE, "CSI feedback modes for CoMP", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-122135_CSI_FEEDBACK_MODES, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120512), vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20120521 - 20120525, XP050600408 [X] 1,5,8,12 * the whole document * [I] 2-4,6,7,9-11,13-15
 [I]  - NTT DOCOMO, "Interference Measurement Mechanism for Rel-11", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-122953 INTERFERENCE ESTIMATION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120525), vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20120521 - 20120525, XP050601188 [I] 1-13 * the whole document *
International search[A]KR20110097623  (LG ELECTRONICS INC.);
 [A]WO2011115421  (LG ELECTRONICS INC.);
 [A]  - SAMSUNG, "Interference Measurement Resource for DL COMP", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #68 R1-120171, DRESDEN, GERMANY, (20120206), XP050562738
 [A]  - QUALCOMM INC., "CSI feedback reporting in support of COMP", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1 #69 R1-122779, PRAGUE, CZECH REPUBLIC, (20120521), XP050600957
 [A]  - HTC, "CSI-RS based IMR in COMP", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1 #69 R1-122324, PRAGUE, CZECH REPUBLIC, (20120521), XP050600587