Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2926411

EP2926411 - ANTENNA DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING DATA OF A FILLING STATE MEASUREMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.03.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Endress+Hauser SE+Co. KG
Hauptstrasse 1
79689 Maulburg / DE
[2018/15]
Former [2015/41]For all designated states
Endress+Hauser GmbH+Co. KG
Hauptstrasse 1
79689 Maulburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BLÖDT, Thomas
Hermann-Burte-Strasse 33
79689 Maulburg / DE
 [2015/41]
Representative(s)Andres, Angelika Maria
Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG
PatServe
Colmarer Strasse 6
79576 Weil am Rhein / DE
[2015/41]
Application number, filing date13798306.026.11.2013
[2015/41]
WO2013EP74689
Priority number, dateDE20121011173203.12.2012         Original published format: DE102012111732
[2015/41]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014086616
Date:12.06.2014
Language:DE
[2014/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2926411
Date:07.10.2015
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2014
[2015/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2926411
Date:14.08.2019
Language:DE
[2019/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01Q7/08, H01Q1/22, H01Q7/00, H01Q7/06
[2019/15]
Former International [2015/41]H01Q7/08, H01Q1/22
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANTENNENVORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON DATEN EINES FÜLLSTANDSMESSGERÄTS[2015/41]
English:ANTENNA DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING DATA OF A FILLING STATE MEASUREMENT DEVICE[2015/41]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ANTENNE DESTINÉ DE TRANSMETTRE DES DONNÉES D'UN APPAREIL DE MESURE DE NIVEAU DE REMPLISSAGE[2015/41]
Entry into regional phase26.05.2015National basic fee paid 
26.05.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
26.05.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/41]
13.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
05.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.07.2019Fee for grant paid
03.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.02.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
24.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
22.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[I]US2009251376  (TAKAHASHI MASAYUKI [JP] ET AL) [I] 1-11 * page 2, paragraph 53 - page 5, paragraph 143 * * figures 1-24 * * abstract *
 [A]CH335727  (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-11 * page 2, line 6 - line 15 * * figure 2 *
 [A]JPH08102613  (ALPHA CORP) [A] 1-11 * figure 1 * * abstract *