Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2766322

EP2766322 - USE OF UNSHAPED REFRACTORY PRODUCTS AS LINING FOR LARGE-SCALE INDUSTRIAL FURNACES AND INDUSTRIAL FURNACE LINED WITH THE UNFIRED REFRACTORY PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/34]USE OF UNFIRED REFRACTORY PRODUCTS AS A LINING IN LARGE-VOLUME INDUSTRIAL FURNACES, AS WELL AS AN INDUSTRIAL FURNACE LINED WITH SAID UNFIRED REFRACTORY PRODUCTS
[2016/30]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.12.2016
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.11.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2019Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Refratechnik Holding GmbH
Adalperostrasse 82
85737 Ismaning / DE
[2014/34]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHEUBEL, Bernd
Tangastraße 15
81827 München / DE
02 / JANSEN, Helge
Hagenring 37
37133 Friedland / DE
03 / KLISCHAT, Hans-Jürgen
Pastor-Sander-Bogen 51
37083 Göttingen / DE
04 / KIZIO, Rolf-Dieter
Lehmkuhle 7
37130 Gleichen / DE
05 / WIRSING, Holger
Jheringstraße 38
37081 Göttingen / DE
 [2014/34]
Representative(s)Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf
Candidplatz 15
81543 München / DE
[2017/07]
Former [2014/34]Solf, Alexander
Patentanwälte Dr. Solf und Zapf Candidplatz 15
D-81543 München / DE
Application number, filing date13798311.026.11.2013
[2017/07]
WO2013EP74785
Priority number, dateDE2012102331829.11.2012         Original published format: DE102012023318
[2014/34]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014083016
Date:05.06.2014
Language:DE
[2014/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2766322
Date:20.08.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2014
[2014/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2766322
Date:15.02.2017
Language:DE
[2017/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:C04B33/04, C04B33/13, C04B35/047, C04B35/103, C04B35/18, C04B35/20, C04B35/42, C04B35/565, C04B35/63, C04B35/634, C04B35/632, C04B35/043, C04B35/057, C04B35/06, C04B35/44, C04B35/66, F23M5/00, F27D1/00, C04B35/101, C04B35/443
[2016/30]
Former International [2014/34]C04B35/00, C04B35/01, C04B35/03, C04B35/04, C04B35/043, C04B35/057, C04B35/06, C04B35/44, C04B35/443, C04B35/66, F23M5/00, F23M5/04, F27B9/16, F27D1/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/34]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON UNGEBRANNTEN FEUERFESTEN ERZEUGNISSEN ALS ZUSTELLUNG VON GROSSVOLUMIGEN INDUSTRIEÖFEN SOWIE INDUSTRIEOFEN AUSGEKLEIDET MIT DEN UNGEBRANNTEN FEUERFESTEN ERZEUGNISSEN[2014/34]
English:USE OF UNSHAPED REFRACTORY PRODUCTS AS LINING FOR LARGE-SCALE INDUSTRIAL FURNACES AND INDUSTRIAL FURNACE LINED WITH THE UNFIRED REFRACTORY PRODUCTS[2016/30]
French:UTILISATION DES PRODUITS RÉFRACTAIRES NON CUITS, NON FACONNES POUR REVÊTER DES GRANDS FOURS INDUSTRIELS ET FOURS INDUSTRIELS REVÊTES AVEC LES PRODUITS RÉFRACTAIRES NON CUITS[2016/30]
Former [2014/34]USE OF UNFIRED REFRACTORY PRODUCTS AS A LINING IN LARGE-VOLUME INDUSTRIAL FURNACES, AS WELL AS AN INDUSTRIAL FURNACE LINED WITH SAID UNFIRED REFRACTORY PRODUCTS
Former [2014/34]UTILISATION DE PRODUITS RÉFRACTAIRES CRUS POUR LE GARNISSAGE DE FOURS INDUSTRIELS DE GRAND VOLUME, AINSI QUE FOUR INDUSTRIEL REVÊTU DE CES PRODUITS RÉFRACTAIRES CRUS
Entry into regional phase09.05.2014National basic fee paid 
09.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
09.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.05.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/34]
09.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.2016Date of oral proceedings
01.07.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
08.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.11.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
04.11.2016Fee for grant paid
04.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.12.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.12.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.07.2015
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  14.11.2017   
Refractory Intellectual Property GmbH & Co. KG
Wienerbergstrasse 11
1100 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
Berkenbrink, Kai-Oliver
Patentanwälte Becker & Müller
Turmstrasse 22
40878 Ratingen / DE
 [2017/51]
14.12.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.04.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
03.04.2019Date of oral proceedings
24.06.2019Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.06.2019Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition17.07.2019Appeal received No.  T2058/19
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.11.2013
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
MT15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
IE26.11.2017
LU26.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/50]CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
MT15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
IE26.11.2017
LU26.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/45]CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
MT15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
IE26.11.2017
LU26.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/43]CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
MT15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
LU26.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/41]CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
LU26.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/33]CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/14]CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2017/51]CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2017/50]CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2017/41]FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Cited inInternational search[X]  - Gerald Routschka / Hartmut Wuthnow, Praxishandbuch Feuerfeste Werkstoffe; 5. Auflage 2011; Vulkan Velag, Essen (DE), (20111014), ISBN 978-3-8027-3161-7, XP002717961 [X] 1-13 * Seiten: Deckblatt; IV; 64-65; 104-105, 118-140 und 150-174. *
ExaminationEP0940376
 WO2014031574
 EP2277842
    - "3.1 Bauxiterzeugnisse", Wolfgang Schulle, Feuerfeste Werkstoffe, Leibzig, Deutscher Verlag für Grundstoffindustrie, (19900101), page Deckblatt, Seite I, Seiten 213-214, ISBN 3-342-00306-5
    - PRAXISHANDBUCH FEUERFESTE WERKSTOFFE : AUFBAU - EIGENSCHAFTEN - PRÜFUNG, VULKAN-VERL, ESSEN, (20111014), ISBN 978-3-8027-3161-7, XP002717961