Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2926191

EP2926191 - SUSPENSION SYSTEM FOR A CAMERA LENS ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.09.2015
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.03.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cambridge Mechatronics Limited
The Westbrook Centre, Building 6
Cambridge
CB4 1YG / GB
[2018/23]
Former [2015/41]For all designated states
Cambridge Mechatronics Limited
St John's Innovation Centre Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WS / GB
Inventor(s)01 / HOWARTH, James
c/o Cambridge Mechatronics Limited
St John's Innovation Centre
Cowley Road
Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 0WS / GB
02 / BROWN, Andrew Benjamin David
c/o Cambridge Mechatronics Limited
St John's Innovation Centre
Cowley Road
Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 0WS / GB
 [2015/41]
Representative(s)J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/41]Merryweather, Colin Henry
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date13798379.720.11.2013
[2015/41]
WO2013GB53062
Priority number, dateGB2012002130627.11.2012         Original published format: GB 201221306
[2015/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014083318
Date:05.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2926191
Date:07.10.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2014
[2015/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:G02B27/64
[2015/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/41]
TitleGerman:AUFHÄNGUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EIN KAMERALINSENELEMENT[2015/41]
English:SUSPENSION SYSTEM FOR A CAMERA LENS ELEMENT[2015/41]
French:SYSTÈME DE SUSPENSION POUR ÉLÉMENT DE LENTILLE DE CAMÉRA[2015/41]
Entry into regional phase19.05.2015National basic fee paid 
19.05.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
19.05.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2008231955  (OTSUKA HIROSHI [JP]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0027] , [0029] , [0037] , [0065] * * figures 1-3,8 * [Y] 3-38;
 [X]US2011013283  (SATO SHIGEKI [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0018] , [0042] , [0083] , [0087] * * figures 5,9,10 *;
 [Y]WO2010089529  (CAMBRIDGE MECHATRONICS LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 3-38 * page 4, paragraphs 10-16 *
by applicantWO2010029316
 WO2010089529
 WO2011104518
 WO2007113478
 WO2012066285
 WO2012020212
 WO2012038703
 WO2013GB51325
 WO2013GB52959