Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2904580

EP2904580 - REAL-TIME IMAGE PROCESSING FOR OPTIMIZING SUB-IMAGES VIEWS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.10.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FI
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09]
Applicant(s)For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
For:DE 
Philips GmbH
Lübeckertordamm 5
20099 Hamburg / DE
[2015/33]
Inventor(s)01 / MAACK, Hanns-Ingo
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2015/33]
Representative(s)Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2019/37]Steffen, Thomas
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2015/33]Steffen, Thomas
Philips International B.V.
Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date13798391.223.09.2013
[2015/33]
WO2013IB58753
Priority number, dateUS201261710049P05.10.2012         Original published format: US 201261710049 P
[2015/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014053942
Date:10.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2904580
Date:12.08.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2014
[2015/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2904580
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06T3/40, G06T5/10
[2015/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/33]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ECHTZEITBILDVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM ZUR OPTIMIERUNG VON SUB-BILD-ANSICHTEN[2015/33]
English:REAL-TIME IMAGE PROCESSING FOR OPTIMIZING SUB-IMAGES VIEWS[2015/33]
French:TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE EN TEMPS RÉEL PERMETTANT D'OPTIMISER LES VUES DE SOUS-IMAGES[2015/33]
Entry into regional phase06.05.2015National basic fee paid 
06.05.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
06.05.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/33]
21.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.12.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.07.2019Fee for grant paid
31.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.08.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
02.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
01.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI11.09.2019
LT11.09.2019
NO11.12.2019
[2020/09]
Former [2020/08]LT11.09.2019
NO11.12.2019
Cited inInternational search[X]US5963676  (WU ZHENYU [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * column 3, line 7 - column 4, line 8 *;
 [X]EP1422662  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0008] , [0 21] , [0 37] , [0 38] , [0 42] *;
 [X]EP0527525  (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [X] 1-14 * page 6, line 23 - line 30 *;
 [A]EP0383269  (ADLER RES ASSOC [US]) [A] 1-14 * page 3, line 37 - page 4, line 57 *;
 [A]EP0712092  (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1341125  (AGFA GEVAERT [BE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5978518  (OLIYIDE OLORUNFUNMI A [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6782137  (AVINASH GOPAL B [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2007050340  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2011008239  (THOMSON LICENSING [FR], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2003161497  (VUYLSTEKE PIETER [BE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0756247  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PACE T. ET AL., "A Multiresolution Approach to Image Enhancement via Histogram Shaping and Adaptive Wiener Filtering", PROC. SPIE, (20080324), vol. 6978, pages 69780401 - 69780411, XP002718184 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.778038
ExaminationUS5542003
    - BESSLER R F ET AL, "CONTRAST ENHANCEMENT USING BURT PYRAMID PROCESSING", DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS (SID) FIRST EDITION, PLAYA DEL REY, CA, US, (19860506), page 352/353, XP001025127
by applicantUS6252931