Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2926415

EP2926415 - POWER CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY HAVING AN ALIGNMENT BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.06.2016
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.06.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.07.2016  [2016/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tyco Electronics Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
[N/P]
Former [2015/41]For all designated states
Tyco Electronics Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ORRIS, David Patrick
901 Timber Lane
Middletown, Pennsylvania 17057 / US
02 / MATTHEWS, Brandon Michael
305 Main Street
McAlisterville, Pennsylvania 17049 / US
 [2015/41]
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/41]Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London
W6 0LE / GB
Application number, filing date13799729.218.11.2013
[2015/41]
WO2013US70550
Priority number, dateUS20121368852129.11.2012         Original published format: US201213688521
[2015/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014085123
Date:05.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2926415
Date:07.10.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2014
[2015/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/11
[2015/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/41]
TitleGerman:STROMSTECKERANORDNUNG MIT EINEM AUSRICHTUNGSELEMENT[2015/41]
English:POWER CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY HAVING AN ALIGNMENT BODY[2015/41]
French:ENSEMBLE CONNECTEUR D'ALIMENTATION AYANT UN CORPS D'ALIGNEMENT[2015/41]
Entry into regional phase07.05.2015National basic fee paid 
07.05.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
07.05.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/41]
19.01.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/28]
23.02.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2016/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2010203752  (URANO TETSU [JP]) [X] 1,3,5,8 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1A-1C * [I] 2,4,6,7
 [X]US2012156909  (TYLER ADAM PRICE [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0045]; figure 3 *
 [A]US4845589  (WEIDLER CHARLES H [US] ET AL) [A] 1 * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 53; figures 2,3 *