Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2857496

EP2857496 - D-GLUCARIC ACID-PRODUCING BACTERIUM, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING D-GLUCARIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.05.2018
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.02.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 10.04.2019  [2019/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ensuiko Sugar Refining Co., Ltd.
9-6, Nihonbashi Horidome-cho 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-0012 / JP
For all designated states
Osaka Municipal Technical Research Institute
6-50, Morinomiya 1-chome
Jyoto-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 536-8553 / JP
[2017/16]
Former [2015/40]For all designated states
Ensuiko Sugar Refining Co.Ltd.
9-6, Nihonbashi Horidome-cho 2 chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-0012 / JP
For all designated states
Osaka Municipal Technical Research Institute
6-50, Morinomiya 1-chome
Jyoto-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 536-8553 / JP
Former [2015/15]For all designated states
Ensuiko Sugar Refining Co.Ltd.
ESR Building 2-9-6 Nihonbashi Horidome-cho Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-0012 / JP
For all designated states
Osaka Municipal Technical Research Institute
6-50, Morinomiya 1-chome Joto-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 536-8553 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / ITO, Tetsuya
c/o Ensuiko Sugar Refining Co., Ltd.
9-6, Nihonbashi Horidome-cho 2-chome
Chuho-ku
Tokyo 103-0012 / JP
02 / TADOKORO, Hiroki
c/o Ensuiko Sugar Refining Co., Ltd.
9-6, Nihonbashi Horidome-cho 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-0012 / JP
03 / MASAKI, Hisaharu
c/o Ensuiko Sugar Refining Co., Ltd.
9-6, Nihonbashi Horidome-cho 2-chome
Chuho-ku
Tokyo 103-0012 / JP
04 / MIKUNI, Katsuhiko
c/o Ensuiko Sugar Refining Co., Ltd.
9-6, Nihonbashi Horidome-cho 2-chome
Chuho-ku
Tokyo 103-0012 / JP
05 / MURAKAMI, Hiromi
c/o Osaka Municipal Technical Research Institute
6-50, Morinomiya 1-chome
Jyoto-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 536-8553 / JP
06 / KISO, Taro
c/o Osaka Municipal Technical Research Institute
6-50, Morinomiya 1-chome
Jyoto-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 536-8553 / JP
07 / KIRYU, Takaaki
c/o Osaka Municipal Technical Research Institute
6-50, Morinomiya 1-chome
Jyoto-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 536-8553 / JP
 [2017/16]
Former [2015/15]01 / ITO, Tetsuya
c/o Ensuiko Sugar Refining Co. Ltd.
9-6 Nihonbashi Horidome-cho 2-chome
Chuho-ku
Tokyo 103-0012 / JP
02 / TADOKORO, Hiroki
c/o Ensuiko Sugar Refining Co. Ltd.
9-6 Nihonbashi Horidome-cho 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-0012 / JP
03 / MASAKI, Hisaharu
c/o Ensuiko Sugar Refining Co. Ltd.
9-6 Nihonbashi Horidome-cho 2-chome
Chuho-ku
Tokyo 103-0012 / JP
04 / MIKUNI, Katsuhiko
c/o Ensuiko Sugar Refining Co. Ltd.
9-6 Nihonbashi Horidome-cho 2-chome
Chuho-ku
Tokyo 103-0012 / JP
05 / MURAKAMI, Hiromi
c/o Osaka Municipal Technical Research Institute
6-50 Morinomiya 1-chome
Jyoto-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 536-8553 / JP
06 / KISO, Taro
c/o Osaka Municipal Technical Research Institute
6-50 Morinomiya 1-chome
Jyoto-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 536-8553 / JP
07 / KIRYU, Takaaki
c/o Osaka Municipal Technical Research Institute
6-50 Morinomiya 1-chome
Jyoto-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 536-8553 / JP
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2017/28]
Former [2015/15]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13800705.903.06.2013
[2017/28]
WO2013JP65414
Priority number, dateJP2012012746704.06.2012         Original published format: JP 2012127467
[2015/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013183610
Date:12.12.2013
Language:JA
[2013/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2857496
Date:08.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2857496
Date:12.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP12.12.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:C12N1/20, C12N1/21, C12N9/02, C12N9/04, C12P7/42, C12P7/46, C12P7/58, C12P19/00
[2016/01]
Former International [2015/15]C12N1/20, C12N1/21, C12N9/02, C12N9/04, C12N15/09, C12P7/24, C12P7/42, C12P7/46
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:D-GLUCARINSÄURE PRODUZIERENDES BAKTERIUM SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON D-GLUCARINSÄURE[2015/15]
English:D-GLUCARIC ACID-PRODUCING BACTERIUM, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING D-GLUCARIC ACID[2015/15]
French:BACTÉRIE PRODUISANT DE L'ACIDE D-GLUCARIQUE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'ACIDE D-GLUCARIQUE[2015/15]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase17.12.2014Translation filed 
17.12.2014National basic fee paid 
17.12.2014Search fee paid 
17.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.04.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
17.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/15]
20.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.05.2017Fee for grant paid
22.05.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.05.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.10.2016
Opposition(s)13.04.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
15.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.07.2017
CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
IT12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
MC12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SI12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
[2019/15]
Former [2018/39]AT12.07.2017
CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
IT12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SI12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/25]AT12.07.2017
CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
IT12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/21]AT12.07.2017
CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/12]AT12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/11]AT12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/10]AT12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
NO12.10.2017
Former [2018/09]FI12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
NO12.10.2017
Former [2018/08]FI12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
NO12.10.2017
Former [2018/07]LT12.07.2017
NO12.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[XD]EP2143785  (ENSUIKO SUGAR REFINING [JP]) [XD] 1,2,6-8 * paragraph [0029]; claims 1-8 *;
 [X]JPH0568542  (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD) [X] 3 * the whole document *;
 [AD]WO2009145838  (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *
International search[X]WO2008139844  (ENSUIKO SUGAR REFINING [JP], et al);
 [X]JPH0568542  (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD);
 [Y]JP2011516063  (MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY);
 [A]JP2003159079  (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO);
 [A]JPH07182  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE);
 [A]JPS62228287  (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD);
 [A]  - ROPER, H., "Selective Oxidation of D-Glucose: Chiral Intermediates for Industrial Utilization.", STARCH, (1990), vol. 42, no. 9, pages 342 - 349, XP055178556

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/star.19900420905
by applicantUS2436659
 US2472168
 US6498269
 US5599977
 US7692041
 WO02074926
 JP3713530B
 WO2009145838
 JPH0356295B
 JP2003159079
 WO2008139844
 JPS62228288
    - CANCER LETTERS, (1990), vol. 54, pages 1 - 8
    - "Top value added chemicals from biomass", Results of screening for potential candidates from sugars and synthesis gas, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, vol. 1
    - METAB. ENG., (2010), vol. 12, no. 3, pages 298 - 305