Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2813932

EP2813932 - SLIDE UNLOCKING METHOD FOR TOUCHSCREEN DEVICE UNDER SCREEN LOCKING STATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.08.2017
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip04.08.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.09.2017  [2017/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huizhou TCL Mobile Communication Co., Ltd.
70 Huifeng 4th Road
Zhongkai Hi-Tech Development District
Huizhou, Guangdong 516006 / CN
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / YAO, Chan
Zeng, Hu
70 Huifeng 4th Road
ZhongKai Hi-tech Development District
Huizhou Guangdong 516006 / CN
02 / WANG, Meili
Zeng, Hu
70 Huifeng 4th Road
ZhongKai Hi-tech Development District
Huizhou Guangdong 516006 / CN
03 / YU, Zhuojun
Zeng, Hu
70 Huifeng 4th Road
ZhongKai Hi-tech Development District
Huizhou Guangdong 516006 / CN
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]Von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date13800952.713.03.2013
WO2013CN72512
Priority number, dateCN2012118594906.06.2012         Original published format: CN201210185949
[2014/51]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013181956
Date:12.12.2013
Language:ZH
[2013/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2813932
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN12.12.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/0488, G06F3/0484, H04M1/67
[2015/50]
Former International [2014/51]G06F3/0484
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
TitleGerman:SCHIEBEENTRIEGELUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE BERÜHRUNGSBILDSCHIRMVORRICHTUNG IN EINEM BILDSCHIRMVERRIEGELUNGSZUSTAND[2014/51]
English:SLIDE UNLOCKING METHOD FOR TOUCHSCREEN DEVICE UNDER SCREEN LOCKING STATE[2014/51]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE DÉVERROUILLAGE PAR GLISSEMENT POUR DISPOSITIF À ÉCRAN TACTILE DANS UN ÉTAT DE VERROUILLAGE D'ÉCRAN[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase18.08.2014Translation filed 
18.08.2014National basic fee paid 
18.08.2014Search fee paid 
18.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
18.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
11.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.04.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/36]
04.05.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/36]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.11.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201705   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2012028773  (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0027] , [0 28] * * paragraphs [0034] - [0037]; figures 3a-3c * * paragraphs [0055] , [0 57]; figures 7b, 7c * * paragraphs [0059] - [0061] - [0 63] , [0 66]; figures 8a, 8c *
International search[XP]CN102750090  (HUIZHOU TCL MOBILE COMM CO LTD);
 [X]CN101866259  (YULONG COMP TELECOMM SCIENT);
 [Y]CN101907968  (HIGH TECH COMP CORP);
 [X]US2009264159  (HSIEH CHIN-YING [TW], et al);
 [X]CN101943993  (SHENZHEN SANGFEI CONSUMER COMM)