Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2859464

EP2859464 - ASSESSMENT OF ELECTRONIC SENSOR DATA TO REMOTELY IDENTIFY A MOTOR VEHICLE AND MONITOR DRIVER BEHAVIOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.03.2015
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2017New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Airbiquity Inc.
1011 Western Avenue Suite 600
Seattle, WA 98104 / US
[2015/16]
Inventor(s)01 / GARRETT, Darrin
1011 Western Avenue
Suite 600
Seattle, WA 98104 / US
02 / MANN, Darren
1011 Western Avenue
Suite 600
Seattle, WA 98104 / US
 [2015/16]
Representative(s)Whitlock, Holly Elizabeth Ann , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/16]Whitlock, Holly Elizabeth Ann , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date13801039.206.06.2013
WO2013US44448
Priority number, dateUS201261657192P08.06.2012         Original published format: US 201261657192 P
[2015/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013184877
Date:12.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/50]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2859464
Date:15.04.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2013
[2015/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US06.03.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:G07C5/00, G06F17/00, G06F19/00
[2015/32]
Former International [2015/16]G06F17/00, G06F19/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/16]
TitleGerman:BEURTEILUNG VON ELEKTRONISCHEN SENSORDATEN ZUR ENTFERNTEN IDENTIFIZIERUNG EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS UND ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DES FAHRVERHALTENS[2015/16]
English:ASSESSMENT OF ELECTRONIC SENSOR DATA TO REMOTELY IDENTIFY A MOTOR VEHICLE AND MONITOR DRIVER BEHAVIOR[2015/16]
French:ÉVALUATION DE DONNÉES DE CAPTEURS ÉLECTRONIQUES PERMETTANT D'IDENTIFIER À DISTANCE UN VÉHICULE À MOTEUR ET DE TÉLÉSURVEILLER UN COMPORTEMENT D'UN CONDUCTEUR[2015/16]
Entry into regional phase23.10.2014National basic fee paid 
23.10.2014Search fee paid 
23.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
23.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/16]
28.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2008000959  (FAORO MICHAEL DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0046] * * figures 1-6 * [I] 11-15;
 [X]US2007229307  (PAWLENKO IVAN [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0027] * * figure 1; claims 1-4 *;
 [X]US2011224865  (GORDON GRANT [US], et al) [X] 1,2,10-13,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0095] * * figures 1-14 *;
 [I]WO2005041071  (ACTIVE RECOGNITION TECHNOLOGIE [US], et al) [I] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0053] *;
 [A]US2011258044  (KARGUPTA HILLOL [US]) [A] 1,2,10-13,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0103] * * paragraph [0134] - paragraph [0202] * * figures 1-14 *;
 [A]US2002190856  (HOWARD CHARLES K [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0051] * * figures 1-6 *;
 [A]EP1978490  (MAGNETI MARELLI SISTEMI ELETTR [IT]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0059] *
International search[A]US2011208567  (RODDY NICHOLAS E [US], et al);
 [A]US2002103622  (BURGE JOHN R [US]);
 [A]US2012089423  (TAMIR ASAF [IL], et al);
 [A]US2011224865  (GORDON GRANT [US], et al);
 [A]US2005089750  (NG CHIN-YEE [US], et al);
 [A]US2008004038  (DUNKO GREGORY A [US])
by applicantUS2008000959
 US2007229307
 US2011224865
 WO2005041071